Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3090010

EP3090010 - NON-DUSTING POLY(PHENYLENE ETHER) PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.12.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  26.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.12.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 22.01.2020  [2020/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SABIC Global Technologies B.V.
Plasticslaan 1
4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL
[2020/04]
Former [2016/45]For all designated states
SABIC Global Technologies B.V.
Plasticslaan 1
4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL
Inventor(s)01 / PETERS, Edward Norman
1 Noryl Avenue
Selkirk, New York 12158 / US
02 / TARKIN-TAS, Eylem
1 Noryl Avenue
Selkirk, New York 12158 / US
03 / LENZ, Douglas Henry
1 Noryl Avenue
Selkirk, New York 12158 / US
 [2016/45]
Representative(s)Lang, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[2016/45]
Application number, filing date14876316.208.12.2014
[2016/45]
WO2014US69043
Priority number, dateUS20141414695203.01.2014         Original published format: US201414146952
[2016/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015102815
Date:09.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3090010
Date:09.11.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.2015
[2016/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3090010
Date:22.01.2020
Language:EN
[2020/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR09.07.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.07.2017
ClassificationInternational:C08J3/12, C08L71/12, C08K5/00
[2016/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/45]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:STAUBFREIE POLY(PHENYLENETHER)PARTIKEL[2016/45]
English:NON-DUSTING POLY(PHENYLENE ETHER) PARTICLES[2016/45]
French:PARTICULES DE POLY(ÉTHER DE PHÉNYLÈNE) NE FORMANT PAS DE POUSSIÈRE[2016/45]
Entry into regional phase12.07.2016National basic fee paid 
12.07.2016Search fee paid 
12.07.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
12.07.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.10.2015Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR
12.07.2016Examination requested  [2016/45]
20.02.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.08.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.12.2019Fee for grant paid
05.12.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.12.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
13.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[I]US2014005340  (PETERS EDWARD NORMAN [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 11, paragraph 137 * * claim 1 *
International search[A]US2013345345  (TAKAMURA NORIHIRO [JP]);
 [A]US2005049362  (BUCKLEY PAUL W [US], et al);
 [A]US2011160421  (TOPLE NITIN VILAS [US], et al);
 [A]WO2007050077  (GEN ELECTRIC [US], et al);
 [A]US2007093635  (INGELBRECHT HUGO G E [BE])