Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3093997

EP3093997 - TRANSMISSION DEVICE, RECEIVING DEVICE, AND TRANSMISSION/RECEIVING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.10.2019
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 13.11.2019  [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The University of Tokyo
3-1, Hongo 7-chome
Bunkyo-ku
Tokyo 113-8654 / JP
For all designated states
Fuji Electric Co., Ltd.
1-1 Tanabeshinden
Kawasaki-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-9530 / JP
[2019/46]
Former [2016/46]For all designated states
The University of Tokyo
3-1 Hongo 7-chome
Bunkyo-ku
Tokyo 113-8654 / JP
For all designated states
Fuji Electric Co., Ltd.
1-1 Tanabeshinden
Kawasaki-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-9530 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KAWAKAMI, Haruki
c/o The University of Tokyo
3-1 Hongo 7-chome
Bunkyo-ku
Tokyo 113-8654 / JP
02 / ASAMI, Tohru
c/o The University of Tokyo
3-1 Hongo 7-chome
Bunkyo-ku
Tokyo 113-8654 / JP
03 / KAWAHARA, Yoshihiro
c/o The University of Tokyo
3-1 Hongo 7-chome
Bunkyo-ku
Tokyo 113-8654 / JP
04 / KISHIRO, Masami
c/o FUJI ELECTRIC CO. LTD.
1-1 Tanabeshinden
Kawasaki-ku
Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210-9530 / JP
05 / KUDO, Takahiro
c/o FUJI ELECTRIC CO. LTD.
1-1 Tanabeshinden
Kawasaki-ku
Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210-9530 / JP
 [2016/46]
Representative(s)Appelt, Christian W.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[2019/46]
Former [2016/46]Appelt, Christian W.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date14877894.725.12.2014
[2016/46]
WO2014JP84427
Priority number, dateJP2014000125107.01.2014         Original published format: JP 2014001251
[2016/46]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015105010
Date:16.07.2015
Language:JA
[2015/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3093997
Date:16.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3093997
Date:13.11.2019
Language:EN
[2019/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP16.07.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.07.2017
ClassificationInternational:H03M7/30, H04N1/32, G06F17/14
[2017/34]
Former International [2016/46]H03M7/30
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/46]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ÜBERTRAGUNGSVORRICHTUNG, EMPFANGSVORRICHTUNG UND SENDE-/EMPFANGSSYSTEM[2016/46]
English:TRANSMISSION DEVICE, RECEIVING DEVICE, AND TRANSMISSION/RECEIVING SYSTEM[2016/46]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ÉMISSION, DISPOSITIF DE RÉCEPTION ET SYSTÈME D'ÉMISSION/RÉCEPTION[2016/46]
Entry into regional phase29.12.2015Translation filed 
29.12.2015National basic fee paid 
29.12.2015Search fee paid 
29.12.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
29.12.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.12.2015Examination requested  [2016/46]
17.11.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.06.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.09.2019Fee for grant paid
30.09.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.09.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XI]  - CAI ZHUORAN ET AL, "An improved Hadamard measurement matrix based on Walsh code for compressive sensing", 2013 9TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INFORMATION, COMMUNICATIONS & SIGNAL PROCESSING, IEEE, (20131210), doi:10.1109/ICICS.2013.6782833, pages 1 - 4, XP032584408 [X] 1-3,5-9,11,12 * abstract * * paragraph [000I] - paragraph [0III] * [I] 4,10,13-16

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICICS.2013.6782833
 [I]  - SHARMA SHREE KRISHNA ET AL, "Spectral efficient compressive transmission framework for wireless communication systems", IET SIGNAL PROCES, THE INSTITUTION OF ENGINEERING AND TECHNOLOGY, MICHAEL FARADAY HOUSE, SIX HILLS WAY, STEVENAGE, HERTS. SG1 2AY, UK, (20130901), vol. 7, no. 7, doi:10.1049/IET-SPR.2012.0075, ISSN 1751-9675, pages 558 - 564, XP006046564 [I] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [03.2] *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/iet-spr.2012.0075
 [I]  - Anonymous, "Hadamard transform", Wikipedia, (20131206), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Hadamard_transform&oldid=584861968, (20170706), XP055388611 [I] 1,4,5,7,10 * the whole document *
    [ ] - Anonymous ET AL, "Walsh function", (20131218), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Walsh_function&oldid=586603661, (20170706), XP055388475 [ ] * the whole document *
 [A]  - Anonymous, "Data compression", Wikipedia, (20140105), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Data_compression&oldid=589250747, (20170706), XP055388502 [A] 1-16 * "Lossy Compression" and "Lossy audio compression" sections *
 [A]  - N. BLACHMAN, "Some Comments Concerning Walsh Functions", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INFORMATION THEORY, USA, (19720501), vol. 18, no. 3, doi:10.1109/TIT.1972.1054806, ISSN 0018-9448, pages 427 - 428, XP055388634 [A] 1-3,5-9,11-16 * abstract * * paragraph [000I] - paragraph [00II] * * paragraph [00IV] *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TIT.1972.1054806
 [A]  - Anonymous, "WALSH FUNCTIONS", Stanford University Online Repository, (19971218), URL: http://sepwww.stanford.edu/public/docs/sep70/carlos1/paper_html/node5.html, (20170706), XP055388569 [A] 1-3,5-9,11-16 * the whole document *
International search[Y]JP2011193431  (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE);
 [Y]JPS57700  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD);
 [A]JP2012507906  (INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORP.)
 [Y]  - CAI ZHUORAN ET AL., "An improved Hadamard measurement matrix based on Walsh code for compressive sensing", INFORMATION, COMMUNICATIONS AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (ICICS) 2013 9TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, (20131210), pages 1 - 4, XP032584408

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICICS.2013.6782833
by applicantJP2013090097