Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3104364 RSS: dossier

Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 122
10.08.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
10.08.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
02.08.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
28.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.03.2017 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
24.02.2017 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
17.02.2017 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
08.02.2017 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
08.02.2017 European search opinion Search / examination 1
08.02.2017 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
08.02.2017 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
25.01.2017 Search started Search / examination 1
20.01.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.01.2017 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
09.12.2016 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
05.12.2016 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
16.11.2016 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
05.10.2016 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
05.10.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
05.10.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
05.10.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
05.10.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
02.09.2016 Abstract Search / examination 1
02.09.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
02.09.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
02.09.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
02.09.2016 Claims Search / examination 4
02.09.2016 Description Search / examination 14
02.09.2016 Drawings Search / examination 6
02.09.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 9
02.09.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
02.09.2016 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 7
02.09.2016 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
08.08.2016 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
08.08.2016 Translation of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
10.06.2016 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
20.10.2015 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
06.08.2015 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
06.08.2015 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
06.08.2015 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 18