Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3110131

EP3110131 - METHOD FOR PROCESSING IMAGE AND ELECTRONIC APPARATUS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.11.2016
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[2016/52]
Inventor(s)01 / YOON, Young-Kwon
403 19 Seochojungang-ro 12-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-878 / KR
02 / NA, Jin-Hee
109-406 50 Hyoryeong-ro 33-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-842 / KR
03 / KANG, Hwa-Yong
541-1202 12 Maeyeong-ro 310beon-gil
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-811 / KR
04 / KIM, Moon-Soo
109-1104 222 Seolleung-ro
Gangnam-gu
Seoul 135-838 / KR
05 / KIM, Tae-Ho
204-1201 188 Gagyeong-ro
Heungdeok-gu
Cheongju-si Chungcheongbuk-do 361-732 / KR
 [2016/52]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/52]Jenkins, Richard Gavin
HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
Application number, filing date14883413.804.12.2014
[2016/52]
WO2014KR11798
Priority number, dateKR2014001895719.02.2014         Original published format: KR 20140018957
[2016/52]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015126044
Date:27.08.2015
Language:KO
[2015/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3110131
Date:28.12.2016
Language:EN
[2016/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR27.08.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.09.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/232, H04N5/262
[2016/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/52]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BILDVERARBEITUNG UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR[2016/52]
English:METHOD FOR PROCESSING IMAGE AND ELECTRONIC APPARATUS THEREFOR[2016/52]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE ET APPAREIL ÉLECTRONIQUE ASSOCIÉ[2016/52]
Entry into regional phase19.09.2016Translation filed 
19.09.2016National basic fee paid 
19.09.2016Search fee paid 
19.09.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
19.09.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.09.2016Examination requested  [2016/52]
19.09.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
16.02.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
15.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
21.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO2013088917  (SONY CORP) [X] 1,5,6,8,9,13,14 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3,10,11;
 [P]US2014334683  (MASUDA ATSUSHI [JP]) [P] * paragraphs [0052] , [0060] , [0061] * * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0144] * * figures 4-14 *;
 [Y]US2014009636  (LEE HAESUN [KR] ET AL) [Y] 2,3,10,11 * paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0088] - paragraph [0090] * * figures 7A-10D *;
 [X]WO2013061947  (FUJI FILM CORP) [X] 1,4,5,7,8,12-15 * the whole document *;
 [P]US2014232928  (ONO SHUJI [JP]) [P] * paragraph [0100] - paragraph [0136] * * figures 7-14 *
International search[YA]KR20100102186  (QUALCOMM INCORPORATED) [Y] 25-28 * See abstract; paragraphs [0012]-[0028], [0041]; claims 1, 8; and figure 4. * [A] 1-24;
 [Y]KR20110020519  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.) [Y] 25-28 * See abstract; paragraphs [0041]-[0051]; claim 1; and figure 5. *;
 [A]KR100801088B  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.) [A] 1-28 * See abstract; paragraphs [0026]-[0043]; claims 1, 27; and figures 6, 11. *;
 [A]KR20120064477  (LG INNOTEK CO., LTD.) [A] 1-28 * See abstract; paragraphs [0019]-[0037]; claim 1; and figure 2. *;
 [A]JP2004140798  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD.) [A] 1-28 * See paragraphs [0032]-[0037]; claim 1; and figures 5-7. *