Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3133406

EP3133406 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ESTIMATING OPERATION STATES OF INDIVIDUAL ELECTRICAL DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.10.2019
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.12.2016
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Saito, Saburo
1-25-17-701 Sasaoka
Chuo-ku
Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 810-0034 / JP
[2017/03]
Inventor(s)01 / SAITO, Saburo
1-25-17-701 Sasaoka
Chuo-ku
Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 810-0034 / JP
02 / IMANISHI, Mamoru
1-36-24 Hibaru
Minami-ku
Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 811-1355 / JP
03 / YAMASHIRO, Kosuke
2-30 Yayoi
Kasuga-shi, Fukuoka 816-0862 / JP
04 / IWAMI, Masakuni
1-12-2 Sarayama
Minami-ku
Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 811-1365 / JP
 [2017/12]
Former [2017/05]01 / SAITO, Saburo
1-25-17-701 Sasaoka
Chuo-ku
Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 810-0034 / JP
02 / IMANISHI, Mamoru
1-36-24 Hibaru
Minami-ku
Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 811-1355 / JP
03 / YAMASHIRO, Kosuke
2-30 Yayoi
Kasuga-shi, Fukuoka 816-0862 / JP
04 / IWAMI, Masakuni
1-12-2 Sarayama
Minami-ku
Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 811-1365 / JP
Former [2017/03]01 / Saito, Saburo
1-25-17-701 Sasaoka
Chuo-ku
Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 810-0034 / JP
02 / Imanishi, Mamoru
1-36-24 Hibaru
Minami-ku
Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 811-1355 / JP
03 / Yamashiro, Kosuke
2-30 Yayoi
Kasuga-shi, Fukuoka 816-0862 / JP
04 / Iwami, Masakuni
1-12-2 Sarayama
Minami-ku
Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 811-1365 / JP
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/03]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
Alpha Tower
Suffolk Street Queensway
Birmingham B1 1TT / GB
Application number, filing date14885734.513.03.2014
[2017/03]
WO2014JP56688
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015136666
Date:17.09.2015
Language:JA
[2015/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3133406
Date:22.02.2017
Language:EN
[2017/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP17.09.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.10.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01R21/00, G01R21/133, G01R31/28
[2017/46]
Former International [2017/03]G01R21/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/03]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR SCHÄTZUNG DER BETRIEBSZUSTÄNDE VON EINZELNEN ELEKTRISCHEN VORRICHTUNGEN[2017/03]
English:DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ESTIMATING OPERATION STATES OF INDIVIDUAL ELECTRICAL DEVICES[2017/03]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR ESTIMER LES ÉTATS DE FONCTIONNEMENT DE DISPOSITIFS ÉLECTRIQUES INDIVIDUELS[2017/03]
Entry into regional phase13.10.2016Translation filed 
13.10.2016National basic fee paid 
13.10.2016Search fee paid 
13.10.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
13.10.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.10.2016Examination requested  [2017/03]
13.10.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
17.05.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.11.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.11.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
13.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2012197560  (KUHNS HAMPDEN [US], et al) [X] 1,9 * paragraphs [0004] - [0028] - [0070] - [0073] - [0078] - [0082] - [0125] - [0135] - [0148] - [0151]; figures 1-4,14-16, * * paragraphs [0186] - [0195] - [0200] - [0204] - [0209] * [I] 2-8,10-16;
 [A]US2011025519  (DONALDSON JAMES [GB], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0061] - [0067] - [0092] , [0137] - [0139] - [0146] - [0154]; figures 1,2,11 *;
 [A]WO2012160062  (UNIV BRUXELLES [BE], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0010] , [0013] - [0014] - [0016] - [0018] - [0026] - [0027] - [0038]; figures 2,6,8 *;
 [A]  - SRINIVASARENGAN KRISHNAN ET AL, "A Framework for Non Intrusive Load Monitoring Using Bayesian Inference", 2013 SEVENTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INNOVATIVE MOBILE AND INTERNET SERVICES IN UBIQUITOUS COMPUTING, IEEE, (20130703), doi:10.1109/IMIS.2013.78, pages 427 - 432, XP032485891 [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0III] - paragraph [00IV]; figures 1-3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IMIS.2013.78
 [A]  - WONG VOON SIONG ET AL, "A fast multiple appliance detection algorithm for non-intrusive load monitoring", 2013 IEEE COMPUTATIONAL INTELLIGENCE APPLICATIONS IN SMART GRID (CIASG), IEEE, doi:10.1109/CIASG.2013.6611502, ISSN 2326-7682, (20130416), pages 80 - 86, (20130925), XP032486882 [A] 1-16 * paragraph [000I] - paragraph [0VII]; figures 1-3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CIASG.2013.6611502
International search[A]JP2013213825  (INFOMETIS CO LTD) [A] 1-16 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2013218715  (INFOMETIS CO LTD) [A] 1-16 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2013210755  (SONY CORP) [A] 1-16 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2012064023  (SONY CORP) [A] 1-16 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2012/0072141 A1 *;
 [A]  - HISAHIDE NAKAMURA et al., "Load Monitoring System of Electric Appliances Based on Hidden Markov Model", The Transactions of the Institute of Electrical Engineers of Japan B, (20061201), vol. 126, no. 12, pages 1223 - 1229, XP 055356058 [A] 1-16
 [A]  - KATSUHISA YOSHIMOTO et al., "Development of Non-Intrusive Load Monitoring System(2)- Estimation of Electricity Consumption of Household Appliances", CRIEPI Research Report, (20010200), pages 1 - 12, XP008184044 [A] 1-16