Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3133406


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
01.11.2019 First examination report
30.10.2019 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
16.03.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.08.2018 Change - representative
25.05.2018 Amendment by applicant
16.03.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.10.2017 Supplementary search report published on  15.11.2017  [2017/46]
13.10.2017 Change - classification published on  15.11.2017  [2017/46]
13.10.2017 Change - classification published on  15.11.2017  [2017/46]
19.05.2017 Change - extension states published on  21.06.2017  [2017/25]
14.03.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.02.2017 Change - inventor published on  22.03.2017  [2017/12]
20.01.2017 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  22.02.2017  [2017/08]
20.01.2017 Request for examination filed published on  22.02.2017  [2017/08]
06.01.2017 Change or deletion - publication of A document published on  06.01.2017  [2017/06]
30.12.2016 Change - inventor published on  01.02.2017  [2017/05]
16.12.2016 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  18.01.2017  [2017/03]
16.12.2016 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
16.12.2016 Request for examination filed published on  18.01.2017  [2017/03]
23.11.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
11.11.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
04.11.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
24.10.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
18.10.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.10.2016 Change - representative
14.10.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
14.10.2016 Amendment by applicant
25.09.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
18.09.2015 PCT data prior to European publication