Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3169087

EP3169087 - GPS SIGNAL ACQUISITION METHOD AND DISTRIBUTED BASE STATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.10.2019
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  14.04.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
[2017/20]
Inventor(s)01 / WANG, Ying
c/o ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
 [2017/20]
Representative(s)Savi, Massimiliano , et al
NOTARBARTOLO & GERVASI S.p.A.
Corso di Porta Vittoria 9
20122 Milano / IT
[2017/20]
Application number, filing date14889085.831.10.2014
[2017/20]
WO2014CN89982
Priority number, dateCN20141032666110.07.2014         Original published format: CN201410326661
[2017/20]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015154443
Date:15.10.2015
Language:ZH
[2015/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3169087
Date:17.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN15.10.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.06.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04W4/02, H04W56/00, H04W88/08
[2017/28]
Former International [2017/20]H04W4/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/20]
TitleGerman:GPS-SIGNALERFASSUNGSVERFAHREN UND VERTEILTE BASISSTATION[2017/20]
English:GPS SIGNAL ACQUISITION METHOD AND DISTRIBUTED BASE STATION[2017/20]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'ACQUISITION DE SIGNAL GPS ET STATION DE BASE DISTRIBUÉE[2017/20]
Entry into regional phase08.02.2017Translation filed 
08.02.2017National basic fee paid 
08.02.2017Search fee paid 
08.02.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
08.02.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.02.2017Examination requested  [2017/20]
08.02.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
20.12.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.10.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
25.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
22.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
29.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]US2013107808  (HE YONG [CN], et al) [X] 1-12 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0085] *;
 [I]CN103259607  (ZTE CORP) [I] 1-12 * claims 1, 7 *;
 [A]US2013308626  (FENG LIEXUN [CN], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0039] *
International search[X]CN103259607  (ZTE CORP) [X] 1, 6, 11, 12 * , claims 1-10, description, paragraphs [0002]-[0062], and figures 1-6 *;
 [A]CN101267251  (ZTE CORP [CN]) [A] 1-12 * , the whole document *;
 [A]CN102624512  (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-12 * , the whole document *