Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3099098

EP3099098 - METHOD, DEVICE AND ELECTRONIC TERMINAL FOR INFORMATION REMINDING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.08.2018
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.12.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[N/P]
Former [2016/48]For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / LI, Zijun
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
02 / HUANG, Jin
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
03 / YANG, Fen
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
04 / LI, Guoliang
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2016/48]
Representative(s)Goddar, Heinz J.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/48]Goddar, Heinz J.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date14889375.318.04.2014
[2016/48]
WO2014CN75659
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015157984
Date:22.10.2015
Language:ZH
[2015/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3099098
Date:30.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN22.10.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.03.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04W4/26, // H04W4/24
[2017/13]
Former International [2016/48]H04W24/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/48]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND ELEKTRONISCHE ENDVORRICHTUNG ZUR INFORMATIONSERINNERUNG[2016/48]
English:METHOD, DEVICE AND ELECTRONIC TERMINAL FOR INFORMATION REMINDING[2016/48]
French:PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET TERMINAL ÉLECTRONIQUE DE RAPPEL D'INFORMATIONS[2016/48]
Entry into regional phase25.08.2016Translation filed 
25.08.2016National basic fee paid 
25.08.2016Search fee paid 
25.08.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
25.08.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.08.2016Examination requested  [2016/48]
29.09.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
19.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.06.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
02.08.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.12.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
16.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
25.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]US2012054661  (RADOS STEVEN R [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0014] , [0034] - [0039] - [0042] - [0043] - [0046] - [0050] - [0055] - [0058] * * figures 6A-6C *;
 [X]CN103002466  (TENCENT TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * page 5, paragraph 8 - paragraph 15 *;
 [A]WO2012047932  (HEADWATER PARTNERS I LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0058] , [0061] , [0065] , [0066] , [0072] , [0076] , [0097] * * abstract * * figures 5-24 *;
 [A]GB2494858  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 1 - page 3 * * page 7 - page 9 * * figure 2 *
International search[X]CN103002466  (TENCENT TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD) [X] 1-15 * , description, paragraphs [0010]-[0054] *;
 [A]CN103248756  (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMM) [A] 1-15 * , the whole document *;
 [A]CN103179589  (CHINA MOBILE GROUP ANHUI CO) [A] 1-15 * , the whole document *;
 [A]US2013272144  (DONG WEI [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * , the whole document *