Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3133894

EP3133894 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SELECTING TERMINAL MODE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.05.2019
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.06.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.12.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  20.01.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  18.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip10.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 12.02.2020  [2020/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2017/08]
Inventor(s)01 / JING, Hao
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2017/08]
Representative(s)Gill Jennings & Every LLP
The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[2017/08]
Application number, filing date14893515.829.05.2014
[2017/08]
WO2014CN78819
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015180103
Date:03.12.2015
Language:ZH
[2015/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3133894
Date:22.02.2017
Language:EN
[2017/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3133894
Date:11.07.2018
Language:EN
[2018/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN03.12.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.04.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04M1/725, H04W12/08, G06F21/60, // H04W4/00, G06F21/34, G06F21/74
[2017/52]
Former International [2017/19]H04W88/02, H04M1/725, H04W12/08
Former International [2017/08]H04W88/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/08]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUSWAHL EINES ENDGERÄTEMODUS[2017/08]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SELECTING TERMINAL MODE[2017/08]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR SÉLECTIONNER UN MODE DE TERMINAL[2017/08]
Entry into regional phase17.11.2016Translation filed 
17.11.2016National basic fee paid 
17.11.2016Search fee paid 
17.11.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
17.11.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.11.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.11.2016Examination requested  [2017/08]
17.11.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
08.12.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.04.2018Fee for grant paid
13.04.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.04.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)12.04.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
31.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL11.07.2018
AT11.07.2018
CZ11.07.2018
DK11.07.2018
EE11.07.2018
ES11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
IT11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
MC11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RO11.07.2018
RS11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
SI11.07.2018
SK11.07.2018
SM11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
[2020/07]
Former [2019/37]AL11.07.2018
AT11.07.2018
CZ11.07.2018
DK11.07.2018
EE11.07.2018
ES11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
IT11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RO11.07.2018
RS11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
SI11.07.2018
SK11.07.2018
SM11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/26]AL11.07.2018
AT11.07.2018
CZ11.07.2018
DK11.07.2018
EE11.07.2018
ES11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
IT11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RO11.07.2018
RS11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
SK11.07.2018
SM11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/23]AL11.07.2018
AT11.07.2018
CZ11.07.2018
EE11.07.2018
ES11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
IT11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RO11.07.2018
RS11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
SK11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/22]AL11.07.2018
AT11.07.2018
CZ11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
IT11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RO11.07.2018
RS11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/21]AL11.07.2018
AT11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
IT11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RS11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/12]AL11.07.2018
AT11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RS11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/11]AT11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RS11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/10]AT11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RS11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/08]FI11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
NO11.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/07]LT11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
Former [2019/04]NL11.07.2018
Documents cited:Search[A]US2013324081  (GARGI ULLAS [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0060] *;
 [A]US2012015629  (OLSEN ERIC K [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0027] *;
 [A]US2012214416  (KENT JONATHAN DOUGLAS [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0051] *;
 [A]US2008293453  (ATLAS SCOTT J [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0036] *;
 [A]US2005186936  (SHIH CHIEN-YI [TW]) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0025] *
International search[X]CN103714285  (SHANGHAI ZHUOYOU NETWORK TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 1-10 * , description, paragraphs 50-88 *;
 [A]CN103445409  (QINGDAO GOERTEK CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * , the whole document *;
 [A]CN103473514  (YULONG COMP COMM TECH SHENZHEN) [A] 1-10 * , the whole document *;
 [A]WO2013079609  (GEMALTO SA [FR]) [A] 1-10 * , the whole document *;
 [A]WO2013078796  (ZTE CORP [CN], et al) [A] 1-10 * , the whole document *