Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3162589

EP3162589 - NON-PNEUMATIC TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.07.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.01.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.05.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  31.03.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  21.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 07.08.2019  [2019/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[2017/18]
Inventor(s)01 / ABE Akihiko
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
Technical Center
3-1-1 Ogawahigashi-cho
Kodaira-shi Tokyo 187-8531 / JP
02 / NISHIDA Masashi
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
Technical Center
3-1-1 Ogawahigashi-cho
Kodaira-shi Tokyo 187-8531 / JP
 [2017/18]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[2019/32]
Former [2017/18]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date14895799.624.06.2014
[2017/18]
WO2014JP66640
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015198387
Date:30.12.2015
Language:JA
[2015/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3162589
Date:03.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3162589
Date:07.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP30.12.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.07.2017
ClassificationInternational:B60B9/04, B60C7/00, B60C7/18, B60B9/26, B60C7/14
[2017/33]
Former International [2017/18]B60B9/04, B60C7/00, B60C7/18
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/18]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:LUFTLOSER REIFEN[2017/18]
English:NON-PNEUMATIC TIRE[2017/18]
French:PNEU NON PNEUMATIQUE[2017/18]
Entry into regional phase21.12.2016Translation filed 
21.12.2016National basic fee paid 
21.12.2016Search fee paid 
21.12.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
21.12.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.12.2016Examination requested  [2017/18]
21.12.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
13.02.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.05.2019Fee for grant paid
10.05.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.05.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XAY]JP2013071652  (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO) [X] 1-4,8 * abstract * [A] 9 [Y] 5-7;
 [XA]KR101252035B  (KIM YOUNG JIN [KR], et al) [X] 1-4,8,9 * figures 4-6 * [A] 5-7;
 [XAY]JP2014008952  (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO) [X] 1-4,8 * abstract * [A] 9 [Y] 5-7;
 [XAYI]JP2013018427  (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO) [X] 1,5,6 * abstract * [A] 9 [Y] 5-7 [I] 2-4,8;
 [XA]US4784201  (PALINKAS RICHARD L [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [A] 3-9;
 [XYI]JP2013018462  (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO) [X] 1,3,4,8 * abstract * [Y] 5-7 [I] 2;
 [XA]WO2010007636  (FIAT GROUP AUTOMOBILES SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1,2,7,8 * the whole document * [A] 3-6,9;
 [XAY]JP2014100933  (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO) [X] 1,2 * abstract * [A] 3,4 [Y] 7;
 [XAYI]JP2011246050  (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO) [X] 1-4,8 * figures 1-9 * [A] 7 [Y] 5,6 [I] 9;
 [E]WO2015072312  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [E] 1,2 * figure 7 *
International search[XY]JP2011246050  (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO) [X] 1-3 * , paragraphs [0021] to [0022], [0064]; fig. 1 to 2 (Family: none) * [Y] 4-9;
 [Y]WO2014069653  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [Y] 4-8 * , paragraphs [0031] to [0032]; fig. 1 & JP 2014-91453 A *;
 [Y]JPS3318103Y  (Nippon Yusoki Co., Ltd.) [Y] 9 * , fig. 4 (Family: none) *;
 [Y]US4295686  (BLACK JOHN W) [Y] 9 * , fig. 3 & GB 2035229 A & DE 2946938 A & FR 2442147 A & CA 1120079 A *;
 [A]US2010230022  (KIM JONG KYUNG [KR]) [A] 1-9 * , fig. 2 & KR 10-2010-0102823 A *;
 [EX]JP2014118128  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [EX] 1-9 * , paragraphs [0014] to [0024]; fig. 1 to 3 (Family: none) *