EP3170675 - THERMOSENSITIVE RECORDING BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2022 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Osaka Sealing Printing Co., Ltd. 1-8, Obase-cho Tennoji-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 543-0028 / JP | [2017/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIMURA, Takayuki c/o OSAKA SEALING PRINTING Co., Ltd. 1-8, Obase-cho Tennoji-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 543-0028 / JP | 02 /
YOSHIDA, Masahiko c/o OSAKA SEALING PRINTING Co., Ltd. 1-8, Obase-cho Tennoji-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 543-0028 / JP | [2017/21] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | [2017/21] | Application number, filing date | 14897873.7 | 14.07.2014 | [2017/21] | WO2014JP03726 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016009462 | Date: | 21.01.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3170675 | Date: | 24.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3170675 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.01.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/337, B41M5/42, // B41M5/44 | [2018/17] | CPC: |
B41M5/3372 (EP,US);
B41M5/28 (KR);
B41M5/3275 (US);
B41M5/3336 (US);
B41M5/337 (EP,KR,US);
B41M5/3377 (EP,US);
B41M5/40 (KR);
B41M5/42 (EP,US);
B41M5/44 (EP,US);
B41M2205/04 (EP,US);
B41M2205/38 (EP,US);
B41M2205/40 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/21] | B41M5/337, B41M5/28, B41M5/30, B41M5/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄRMEEMPFINDLICHER AUFZEICHNUNGSKÖRPER | [2017/21] | English: | THERMOSENSITIVE RECORDING BODY | [2017/21] | French: | CORPS D'ENREGISTREMENT THERMOSENSIBLE | [2017/21] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2017 | Translation filed | 01.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2017 | Search fee paid | 01.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/21] | 01.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.12.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 14.02.2017 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.03.2017 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.07.2014 | AL | 17.03.2021 | CY | 17.03.2021 | CZ | 17.03.2021 | DK | 17.03.2021 | EE | 17.03.2021 | HR | 17.03.2021 | LT | 17.03.2021 | LV | 17.03.2021 | MC | 17.03.2021 | NL | 17.03.2021 | PL | 17.03.2021 | RO | 17.03.2021 | RS | 17.03.2021 | SI | 17.03.2021 | SK | 17.03.2021 | SM | 17.03.2021 | BG | 17.06.2021 | GR | 18.06.2021 | IE | 14.07.2021 | LU | 14.07.2021 | IS | 17.07.2021 | PT | 19.07.2021 | [2023/30] |
Former [2023/27] | HU | 14.07.2014 | |
AL | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IE | 14.07.2021 | ||
LU | 14.07.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IE | 14.07.2021 | ||
LU | 14.07.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
LU | 14.07.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | CZ | 17.03.2021 | |
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | CZ | 17.03.2021 | |
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | CZ | 17.03.2021 | |
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | CZ | 17.03.2021 | |
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | HR | 17.03.2021 | |
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | HR | 17.03.2021 | |
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | HR | 17.03.2021 | |
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | HR | 17.03.2021 | |
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | HR | 17.03.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP2554392 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3,11 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0059] * * paragraphs [0070] , [0071] , [0076] *[A] 2,4-10; | [E]EP3026089 (OSAKA SEALING LABEL PRINT [JP]) [E] 1-11 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0084]; examples 1-7 *; | [E]EP3069894 (OSAKA SEALING LABEL PRINT [JP]) [E] 1-11 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0083] - paragraph [0090] * * example 1 * | International search | [XY]JPH08156406 (RICOH KK) [X] 1-4, 11 * , claims; paragraphs [0002], [0021] to [0022]; examples (Family: none) * [Y] 7, 8; | [XY]JP2005040989 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [X] 1, 2, 5, 6, 11 * , claims; paragraphs [0097] to [0103]; examples (Family: none) * [Y] 7, 8; | [XY]JP2010023252 (OJI PAPER CO) [X] 1, 2, 5, 6, 11 * , claims; paragraph [0095]; examples (Family: none) * [Y] 7, 8; | [XY]WO2011027752 (JUJO PAPER CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1, 2, 5, 6, 9, 10 * , claims; examples & JP 5340394 B & US 2012/0208698 A1 & EP 2474963 A1 & CN 102483886 A *[Y] 7, 8 |