Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3174079

EP3174079 - WATERPROOF KEY STRUCTURE AND WATERPROOF MOBILE PHONE UTILIZING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.04.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.01.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.04.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  23.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Power Idea Technology (Shenzhen) Co., Ltd.
4th Floor A Section
Languang Science&Technology Building
No. 7 Xinxi Road
Hi-Tech Industrial Park North, Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
[2017/22]
Inventor(s)01 / MA, Jidong
4th Floor A Section
Languang Science&Technology Building
No. 7 Xinxi Road
Hi-Tech Industrial Park North, Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
02 / CHEN, Dongming
4th Floor A Section
Languang Science&Technology Building
No. 7 Xinxi Road
Hi-Tech Industrial Park North, Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
 [2019/20]
Former [2017/22]01 / MA, Jidong
4th Floor A Section
Languang Science&Technology Building
No. 7 Xinxi Road
Hi-Tech Industrial Park North, Nanshan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
02 / CHEN, Dongming
4th Floor A Section
Languang Science&Technology Building
No. 7 Xinxi Road
Hi-Tech Industrial Park North, Nanshan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
Representative(s)CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP
Cannon Place
78 Cannon Street
London EC4N 6AF / GB
[2019/20]
Former [2017/22]Cordina, Kevin John
Olswang LLP
90 High Holborn
London WC1V 6XX / GB
Application number, filing date14898536.926.07.2014
[2017/22]
WO2014CN83099
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016015185
Date:04.02.2016
Language:ZH
[2016/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3174079
Date:31.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3174079
Date:15.05.2019
Language:EN
[2019/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN04.02.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.03.2018
ClassificationInternational:H01H13/06, H04M1/02, H01H13/86, // H04B1/3888, H04M1/18, H04M1/23, H04B1/38
[2018/15]
Former International [2017/22]H01H13/06, H04M1/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/22]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:WASSERDICHTE TASTENSTRUKTUR UND WASSERDICHTES MOBILTELEFON DAMIT[2017/22]
English:WATERPROOF KEY STRUCTURE AND WATERPROOF MOBILE PHONE UTILIZING SAME[2017/22]
French:STRUCTURE DE TOUCHE ÉTANCHE À L'EAU ET TÉLÉPHONE MOBILE ÉTANCHE À L'EAU L'UTILISANT[2017/22]
Entry into regional phase23.11.2016Translation filed 
23.11.2016National basic fee paid 
23.11.2016Search fee paid 
23.11.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
23.11.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.11.2016Examination requested  [2017/22]
23.11.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
24.05.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.04.2019Fee for grant paid
04.04.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.04.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
11.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL15.05.2019
ES15.05.2019
FI15.05.2019
HR15.05.2019
LT15.05.2019
LV15.05.2019
NL15.05.2019
RS15.05.2019
SE15.05.2019
BG15.08.2019
NO15.08.2019
GR16.08.2019
PT15.09.2019
[2019/51]
Former [2019/50]AL15.05.2019
ES15.05.2019
FI15.05.2019
HR15.05.2019
LT15.05.2019
LV15.05.2019
NL15.05.2019
RS15.05.2019
SE15.05.2019
NO15.08.2019
GR16.08.2019
PT15.09.2019
Former [2019/49]AL15.05.2019
ES15.05.2019
FI15.05.2019
HR15.05.2019
LT15.05.2019
NL15.05.2019
SE15.05.2019
NO15.08.2019
PT15.09.2019
Former [2019/48]ES15.05.2019
FI15.05.2019
LT15.05.2019
SE15.05.2019
NO15.08.2019
PT15.09.2019
Former [2019/47]ES15.05.2019
FI15.05.2019
LT15.05.2019
NO15.08.2019
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE3521176  (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8-13 * column 2, line 48 - column 4, line 18; figures 1-5 * [Y] 4,7,14;
 [Y]EP2738783  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 4,14 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0057]; figures 1-7 *;
 [Y]US2009159412  (LIU YE [CN], et al) [Y] 7,14 * paragraph [0027] *
International search[X]US4170104  (YAMAGATA HISAO [JP]) [X] 1-14 * , description, column 2, line 18 to column 3, line 57, and figures 1 and 4 *;
 [A]US2011005908  (LIN YUNG-FENG [TW], et al) [A] 1-14 * , the whole document *;
 [A]US2007034493  (KAWASAKI YASUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * , the whole document *;
 [A]JP2009070657  (HITACHI KOKUSAI DENKI ENG KK) [A] 1-14 * , the whole document *;
 [A]WO2014092117  (KYOCERA CORP [JP]) [A] 1-14 * , the whole document *