EP3182745 - RESOURCE SHARING METHOD AND RESOURCE SHARING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.08.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.05.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yulong Computer Telecommunication Scientific (Shenzhen) Co., Ltd. 6/F, Building 1, Coolpad Cyber Harbor Hi-Tech Industrial Park (North) Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2017/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Yunfei No. 2 Mengxi Road North of High-tech Garden Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
FU, Ting No. 2 Mengxi Road North of High-tech Garden Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
CAO, Yiqing No. 2 Mengxi Road North of High-tech Garden Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 04 /
ZHANG, Chenlu No. 2 Mengxi Road North of High-tech Garden Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 05 /
ZHU, Yajun No. 2 Mengxi Road North of High-tech Garden Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2017/25] | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/25] | Cordina, Kevin John CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | Application number, filing date | 14899580.6 | 29.09.2014 | [2017/25] | WO2014CN87833 | Priority number, date | CN20141405103 | 15.08.2014 Original published format: CN201410405103 | [2017/25] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016023262 | Date: | 18.02.2016 | Language: | ZH | [2016/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3182745 | Date: | 21.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W12/00 | [2017/25] | CPC: |
H04W12/03 (EP,US);
H04W12/08 (EP,KR,US);
H04L63/08 (US);
H04L63/10 (KR,US);
H04W12/06 (KR);
H04W12/062 (EP,US);
H04W48/02 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/25] | Title | German: | RESSOURCENTEILUNGSVERFAHREN UND RESSOURCENTEILUNGSSYSTEM | [2017/25] | English: | RESOURCE SHARING METHOD AND RESOURCE SHARING SYSTEM | [2017/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PARTAGE DE RESSOURCES ET SYSTÈME DE PARTAGE DE RESSOURCES | [2017/25] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2017 | Translation filed | 26.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2017 | Search fee paid | 26.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/25] | 26.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/39] | 15.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN101299869 (ALCATEL SHANGHAI BELL CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-16 * description, page 5, line 7 to page 9, line 1, figure 1 *; | [A]CN102638852 (CHINA ACADEMY OF TELECOMM TECH) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US2014036762 (AL-SHALASH MAZIN [US]) [A] 1-16* the whole document * |