Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3189682

EP3189682 - METHOD AND APPARATUS OF UE THROUGHPUT IMPROVEMENT FOR LTE+GSM PHONE IN TDD-LTE NETWORK WITH NO DTX DETECTION SUPPORT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.04.2019
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.06.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  13.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.09.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[N/P]
Former [2017/28]For all designated states
QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GUO, Jiming
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / AMINZADEH GOHARI, Amir
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
03 / SHAH, Chintan Shirish
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
04 / RU, Congchong
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
05 / GHOLMIEH, Aziz
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2017/28]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2017/28]
Application number, filing date14901265.002.09.2014
[2017/28]
WO2014CN85728
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016033731
Date:10.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3189682
Date:12.07.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2016
[2017/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN10.03.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.03.2018
ClassificationInternational:H04W8/18, H04W72/12, // H04W88/06
[2018/16]
Former International [2017/28]H04W8/18
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/28]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR UE-DURCHSATZVERBESSERUNG FÜR LTE+GSM-TELEFON IN TDD-LTE-NETZWERK OHNE DTX-DETEKTIONSUNTERSTÜTZUNG[2017/28]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS OF UE THROUGHPUT IMPROVEMENT FOR LTE+GSM PHONE IN TDD-LTE NETWORK WITH NO DTX DETECTION SUPPORT[2017/28]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'AMÉLIORATION DE DÉBIT D'UE POUR TÉLÉPHONE LTE+GSM DANS UN RÉSEAU TDD-LTE SANS ASSISTANCE DE DÉTECTION DE DTX[2017/28]
Entry into regional phase13.01.2017National basic fee paid 
13.01.2017Search fee paid 
13.01.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
13.01.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.01.2017Examination requested  [2017/28]
13.01.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
14.09.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.04.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
07.05.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.09.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
11.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
11.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XAI]US2013286853  (SHI JIANXIONG [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,9,10,12,13,15 * paragraphs [0032] , [0033] , [0037] - [0039] - [ 0045] - [0047] - [ 0066] , [ 0068]; figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0074] , [0075] * [A] 6-8,14 [I] 2,11;
 [A]US2014220981  (JHENG YU-SYUAN [TW], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0003] , [ 0004] , [ 0007] - [0009] - [0023] , [0024] , [0026] , [0030] , [0031] * * paragraphs [0034] - [0037]; figures 1,2,6,7 *;
 [A]US2014044046  (VANGALA SARMA V [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[A]US2012190362  (QUALCOMM, INCORPORATED) [A] 1-28 * description, paragraphs [0021]-[0025], [0036], [0049]-[0054] and figures 2 and 5 *;
 [A]US2013267267  (MUJTABA, SYED AON ET AL.) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2013023275  (QUALCOMM INCORPORATED) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2012020310  (QUALCOMM INCORPORATED) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2013260761  (QUALCOMM INCORPORATED) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *