Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3197186 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3197186



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 772
26.08.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
18.07.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
03.07.2019 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
03.07.2019 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
03.07.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 6
03.07.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 6
03.07.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
03.07.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
07.03.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
07.03.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
07.03.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
07.03.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 91
07.03.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 91
08.02.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
08.02.2019 Claims Search / examination 6
08.02.2019 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
06.02.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
06.02.2019 Claims Search / examination 6
06.02.2019 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
09.11.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
09.11.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
29.10.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
28.02.2018 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
28.02.2018 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
28.02.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
28.02.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
28.02.2018 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
28.02.2018 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
28.02.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 3
28.02.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 3
28.02.2018 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
28.02.2018 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
28.02.2018 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
29.09.2017 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
12.09.2017 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
12.09.2017 European search opinion Search / examination 4
12.09.2017 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
12.09.2017 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
29.08.2017 Search started Search / examination 1
28.06.2017 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
24.05.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.05.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.04.2017 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
25.04.2017 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 12
21.04.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
21.04.2017 Abstract Search / examination 1
21.04.2017 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
21.04.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 34
21.04.2017 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 74
21.04.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 75
21.04.2017 Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 10
21.04.2017 Amended drawings with annotations Search / examination 10
21.04.2017 Annex Search / examination 1
21.04.2017 Annex Search / examination 1
21.04.2017 Claims Search / examination 34
21.04.2017 Description Search / examination 75
21.04.2017 Drawings Search / examination 10
21.04.2017 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
03.03.2017 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
28.04.2016 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
28.04.2016 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
28.04.2016 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 96