Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3197186


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.07.2019 (Expected) grant published on  14.08.2019  [2019/33]
12.07.2019 Change - divisional application(s) published on  14.08.2019  [2019/33]
05.07.2019 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
29.06.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
29.06.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
06.03.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
15.02.2019 Change - classification published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
15.02.2019 Change - classification published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
07.02.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
20.11.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
09.11.2018 First examination report
02.11.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.03.2018 Amendment by applicant
22.12.2017 Change - extension states published on  24.01.2018  [2018/04]
31.10.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.09.2017 Supplementary search report published on  11.10.2017  [2017/41]
08.09.2017 Change - classification published on  11.10.2017  [2017/41]
08.09.2017 Change - classification published on  11.10.2017  [2017/41]
23.06.2017 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.07.2017  [2017/30]
23.06.2017 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
23.06.2017 Request for examination filed published on  26.07.2017  [2017/30]
26.05.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
04.05.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
25.04.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.04.2017 Amendment by applicant
21.04.2017 Change - representative
21.04.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
03.05.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
29.04.2016 PCT data prior to European publication