Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP3197186

Designated contracting statesAL 
 AT 
 BE 
 BG 
 CH 
CY 
 CZ 
 DE 
 DK 
 EE 
 ES 
 FI 
 FR 
 GB 
 GR 
 HR 
 HU 
 IE 
 IS 
 IT 
 LI 
 LT 
 LU 
LV 
 MC 
 MK 
 MT 
 NL 
 NO 
 PL 
 PT 
 RO 
 RS 
 SE 
 SI 
 SK 
 SM 
 TR 
Examination procedure03.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Entry into regional phase21.04.2017Translation filed 
21.04.2017National basic fee paid 
21.04.2017Search fee paid 
21.04.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
21.04.2017Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
30.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
European patent granted14.08.2019
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:26.07.2017 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20170421
 
Event date:26.07.2017 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:BA ME
 
Event date:26.07.2017 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:11.10.2017 
Event description:SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20170912
 
Event date:11.10.2017 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:H04W 72/00 20090101ALI20170906BHEP
 
Event date:11.10.2017 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:H04W 4/06 20090101AFI20170906BHEP
 
Event date:24.01.2018 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)
 
Event date:12.12.2018 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20181109
 
Event date:20.03.2019 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:H04W 4/06 20090101AFI20190214BHEP
 
Event date:20.03.2019 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:H04W 72/04 20090101ALI20190214BHEP
 
Event date:20.03.2019 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:H04W 74/08 20090101ALN20190214BHEP
 
Event date:20.03.2019 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:H04W 72/02 20090101ALI20190214BHEP
 
Event date:20.03.2019 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:H04W 72/12 20090101ALI20190214BHEP
 
Event date:03.04.2019 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED
Effective DATE:20190307
 
Event date:14.08.2019 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:14.08.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:15.08.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT REF 1168480 AT T
Code Expl.:+REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)
Effective DATE:20190815
 
Event date:15.08.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:04.09.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:05.09.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R096 602014051987 DE
Code Expl.:+DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT