Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3197186

EP3197186 - INFORMATION TRANSMISSION METHOD, DEVICE, AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.07.2019
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.03.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.11.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.06.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  21.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 14.08.2019  [2019/33]
12.07.2019Change - divisional application(s)published on 14.08.2019  [2019/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2017/30]
Inventor(s)01 / ZENG, Qinghai
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
02 / ZHANG, Jian
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2017/30]
Representative(s)Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Theresienhöhe 11a
80339 München / DE
[2017/30]
Application number, filing date14904325.920.10.2014
[2017/30]
WO2014CN88964
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016061737
Date:28.04.2016
Language:ZH
[2016/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3197186
Date:26.07.2017
Language:EN
[2017/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3197186
Date:14.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN28.04.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.09.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04W4/06, H04W72/02, H04W72/04, H04W72/12, // H04W74/08
[2019/12]
Former International [2017/41]H04W4/06, H04W72/00
Former International [2017/30]H04W4/06
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/30]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:INFORMATIONSÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN, -VORRICHTUNG UND -SYSTEM[2017/30]
English:INFORMATION TRANSMISSION METHOD, DEVICE, AND SYSTEM[2017/30]
French:PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME DE TRANSMISSION D'INFORMATIONS[2017/30]
Entry into regional phase21.04.2017Translation filed 
21.04.2017National basic fee paid 
21.04.2017Search fee paid 
21.04.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
21.04.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.04.2017Examination requested  [2017/30]
21.04.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
28.02.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.11.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.02.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.06.2019Fee for grant paid
26.06.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP19184774.8
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
30.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP1926337  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2,5,11,12 * paragraphs [0016] - [0022] * * paragraphs [0039] - [0059]; figure 1 * [I] 3,4,6-10,13-20;
 [XI]US2013121133  (ANCHAN KIRANKUMAR [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,11-13 * paragraphs [0025] - [0068] * * figures 5A-8 * [I] 3,5-10,14-20;
 [A]US2013286960  (LI YING [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0078] - [0111] * * paragraphs [0161] - [0170] *;
 [A]  - KIM JOONGHEON ET AL, "Joint Scalable Coding and Routing for 60 GHz Real-Time Live HD Video Streaming Applications", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON BROADCASTING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, vol. 59, no. 3, doi:10.1109/TBC.2013.2273598, ISSN 0018-9316, (20130901), pages 500 - 512, (20130823), XP011524837 [A] 1-20 * Sections I-IV *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TBC.2013.2273598
International search[X]CN101998260  (ZTE CORP) [X] 1-154 * the abstract, description, paragraphs [0051] to [0078] *