Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3226379

EP3226379 - UNINTERRUPTIBLE POWER SUPPLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.09.2017
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  14.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.11.2018Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toshiba Mitsubishi-Electric Industrial Systems Corporation
3-1-1, Kyobashi
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-0031 / JP
[2017/40]
Inventor(s)01 / TOYODA, Masaru
c/o TOSHIBA MITSUBISHI-ELECTRIC
INDUSTRIAL SYSTEMS CORPORATION
3-1-1 Kyobashi
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-0031 / JP
02 / KINOSHITA, Masahiro
c/o TOSHIBA MITSUBISHI-ELECTRIC
INDUSTRIAL SYSTEMS CORPORATION
3-1-1 Kyobashi
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-0031 / JP
 [2017/40]
Representative(s)Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej
Venner Shipley LLP
Byron House
Cambridge Business Park
Cowley Road
Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB
[2017/40]
Application number, filing date14906685.427.11.2014
[2017/40]
WO2014JP81313
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016084179
Date:02.06.2016
Language:JA
[2016/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3226379
Date:04.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP02.06.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.07.2018
ClassificationInternational:H02J9/06
[2017/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/40]
TitleGerman:UNUNTERBRECHBARE STROMVERSORGUNG[2017/40]
English:UNINTERRUPTIBLE POWER SUPPLY[2017/40]
French:ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE SANS COUPURE[2017/40]
Entry into regional phase13.04.2017Translation filed 
13.04.2017National basic fee paid 
13.04.2017Search fee paid 
13.04.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
13.04.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.04.2017Examination requested  [2017/40]
13.04.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
28.11.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
17.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
19.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP2582013  (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1 * Paragraphs [0051], [0054], [0077]-[0079];; figures 1, 3 * [I] 2-8
International search[A]JP2011135708  (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-8 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2010124557  (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-8 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *