Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3225848

EP3225848 - SCREW COMPRESSOR AND REFRIGERATION CYCLE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.09.2017
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  05.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.11.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
[2017/40]
Inventor(s)01 / KAMIKAWA, Masaaki
c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
02 / KANDA, Masahiro
c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
 [2017/40]
Representative(s)Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Theresienhöhe 11a
80339 München / DE
[2017/40]
Application number, filing date14906847.026.11.2014
[2017/40]
WO2014JP81284
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016084176
Date:02.06.2016
Language:JA
[2016/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3225848
Date:04.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP02.06.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.09.2018
ClassificationInternational:F04C18/52, F04C18/16, F04C28/26, F04C29/04, F04C28/12, F04C29/00
[2018/27]
Former International [2017/40]F04C18/52, F04C18/16, F04C28/26, F04C29/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/40]
TitleGerman:SCHRAUBENVERDICHTER UND KÜHLZYKLUSVORRICHTUNG[2017/40]
English:SCREW COMPRESSOR AND REFRIGERATION CYCLE DEVICE[2017/40]
French:COMPRESSEUR À VIS ET DISPOSITIF À CYCLE DE RÉFRIGÉRATION[2017/40]
Entry into regional phase04.05.2017Translation filed 
04.05.2017National basic fee paid 
04.05.2017Search fee paid 
04.05.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
04.05.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.05.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.05.2017Examination requested  [2017/40]
04.05.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
13.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
14.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XI]US3859814  (GRANT WHITNEY I) [X] 1 * the whole document * * column 2, line 61 - column 4, line 3 * * figures 1,2 * [I] 2,3;
 [XI]JPS55156291  (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * [I] 2,3;
 [E]EP3006740  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [E] 1-3 * the whole document * * figures 4(b),12(d) * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0035] *;
 [E]EP3199814  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [E] 1-3 * the whole document * * figures 1,2,4,6 * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0052] *
International search[A]WO2008153061  (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * , paragraphs [0028] to [0036], [0056] to [0063]; fig. 1, 7 & JP 2009-19624 A & JP 4183021 B1 & US 2010/0229595 A1 & EP 2166229 A1 & CN 101680450 A *;
 [A]JPH04136663  (DAIKIN IND LTD) [A] 1-5 * , page 3, upper left column, line 6 to page 4, lower right column, line 16; fig. 1 to 4 (Family: none) *;
 [A]WO2009011223  (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * , entire text; all drawings & JP 2009-24534 A *