EP3225565 - SINGLE-THREAD SCREW THREAD VARIATOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.01.2024 [2024/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ICMATECH INOVAÇÕES TECNOLÓGICAS LTDA Rua da Assembleia, 38 - 6° andar Rio de Janeiro, RJ / BR | [2017/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COSTA, Ivan Ferreira Da Av. José Antonio Cabral N°419 Bairro Jardim Rosa de Franca 07081-000 Guarulhos, SP / BR | [2017/40] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/40] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14907144.1 | 24.11.2014 | [2017/40] | WO2014BR00415 | Filing language | PT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016082008 | Date: | 02.06.2016 | Language: | PT | [2016/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3225565 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | BR | 02.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/74, B65D41/04 | [2018/32] | CPC: |
B65D41/0471 (EP,RU,US);
B65D5/748 (EP,US);
B65D51/22 (RU)
|
Former IPC [2017/40] | B65D51/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/40] | Title | German: | EINZELGEWINDESCHRAUBENVARIATORVORRICHTUNG | [2017/40] | English: | SINGLE-THREAD SCREW THREAD VARIATOR DEVICE | [2017/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF VARIATEUR DE VISSAGE EN FILET UNIQUE | [2017/40] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2017 | Translation filed | 15.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2017 | Search fee paid | 15.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/40] | 15.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/02] | 05.09.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDA]WO9903747 (CLOSURES & PACKAGING SERV LTD [GB], et al) [XD] 12,13 * Figures 1, 2 and related text in the description * [A] 1-11; | [A]US5947318 (PALM LARS ERIK [SE]) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [A]US6015054 (KING ROGER MILNER [GB], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [XA]BRMU9100630U (FERREIRA DA COSTA IVAN [BR]) [X] 1,8 * the whole document * [A] 2-7,9-11; | [X]US2013248530 (ROUQUETTE ALEXANDRE [FR], et al) [X] 12,13 * Figures 1, 3a and related text in the description * | International search | [A]WO03035491 (REXAM MEDICAL PACKAGING INC [US], et al) [A] 1 until 4 * the whole document *; | [A]BR0311973 (SIG TECHNOLOGY AG SIG TECHNOLO [CH]) [A] 1 until 4 * the whole document *; | [A]BRPI0702838 (SIG TECHNOLOGY AG SIG TECHNOLO [CH]) [A] 1 until 4* the whole document *; | [A]BRMU9100630U (FERREIRA DA COSTA IVAN [BR]) [A] 1 until 4 * the whole document * |