blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2902834 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2902834



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 278
09.07.2019 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.06.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.06.2019 Enquiry as to the processing of the file Search / examination 1
25.06.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
06.04.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
06.04.2018 Claims Search / examination 5
06.04.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
07.03.2018 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
28.02.2018 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
21.02.2018 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
27.10.2017 Annex to a communication Search / examination 13
27.10.2017 Annex to a communication Search / examination 11
27.10.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
27.10.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
16.10.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
27.02.2017 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.02.2017 Enquiry as to the processing of the file Search / examination 1
22.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.02.2017 Deficiencies in an enquiry Search / examination 1
09.02.2017 General enquiry Search / examination 1
06.02.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
06.02.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
06.02.2016 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
06.02.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
06.02.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
05.02.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
05.02.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
05.02.2016 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
05.02.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
05.02.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
15.01.2016 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
15.01.2016 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
15.01.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
10.08.2015 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
08.07.2015 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
17.06.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
17.06.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 5
17.06.2015 European search report Search / examination 2
05.06.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
02.04.2015 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
30.03.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 20
13.03.2015 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
13.03.2015 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
25.02.2015 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
10.02.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
07.02.2015 Abstract Search / examination 1
07.02.2015 Claims Search / examination 4
07.02.2015 Description Search / examination 25
07.02.2015 Drawings Search / examination 8
07.02.2015 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8
29.01.2015 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
29.01.2015 Drawings Search / examination 8
29.01.2015 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 10
29.01.2015 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 30
28.01.2015 Drawings Search / examination 8
28.01.2015 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
28.01.2015 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8
28.01.2015 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 30