blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2902834


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
02.02.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.08.2018 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
01.08.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.04.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
08.03.2018 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
24.02.2018 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
03.11.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
20.10.2017 First examination report
03.02.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.02.2016 Amendment by applicant
29.01.2016 Request for examination filed published on  02.03.2016  [2016/09]
29.01.2016 Change - designated states published on  02.03.2016  [2016/09]
04.08.2015 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
03.02.2015 Change - representative