Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2902834

EP2902834 - Image stabilizing device and system for telescopic optical instruments [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.10.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.02.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kamakura Koki Co., Ltd
3-6-12 Tsukagoshi
Warabi-shi, Saitama / JP
[2015/32]
Inventor(s)01 / Ando, Kunio
1-9-1-1904 Kamiochiai
Chuo-ku
Saitama-shi, Saitama / JP
02 / Kato, Masashi
c/o kamakura Kuki Co., Ltd
3-6-12- Tsukagoshi
Warabi-shi, Saitama / JP
03 / Itoh, Haruo
225-7 Araichou,
Hodogaya-ku
Yolohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP
04 / Miyaji, Kazuya
c/o kamakura Kuki Co., Ltd
3-6-12- Tsukagoshi
Warabi-shi, Saitama / JP
 [2015/32]
Representative(s)Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt, Rennerle 10
88131 Lindau / DE
[2015/32]
Application number, filing date15000247.528.01.2015
[2015/32]
Priority number, dateJP2014001625031.01.2014         Original published format: JP 2014016250
[2015/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2902834
Date:05.08.2015
Language:EN
[2015/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:G02B23/18, G02B27/64, H02K1/00
[2015/32]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/09]
Former [2015/32]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Bildstabilisierungsvorrichtung und System für teleskopische optische Geräte[2015/32]
English:Image stabilizing device and system for telescopic optical instruments[2015/32]
French:Dispositif de stabilisation d'image et système pour instruments optiques télescopiques[2015/32]
Examination procedure15.01.2016Examination requested  [2016/09]
05.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.10.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.04.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
30.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201804   M06   Fee paid on   30.07.2018
Documents cited:Search[Y]JPH0815647  (FUJI PHOTO OPTICAL CO LTD) [Y] 1-17 * abstract *;
 [Y]JP2009288612  (CANON KK) [Y] 1-17 * abstract *;
 [A]US2013194666  (TEROERDE STEFFEN [DE] ET AL) [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0084] , [0085] , [0088] , [0089] , [0090]; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US2013176620  (SATO KOJI [JP]) [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0027] - [0033]; figure 2 *;
 [A]US5798863  (UDAGAWA TETSUO [JP] ET AL) [A] 1,9 * column 9, line 35 - column 10, line 22; figures 13,14 *
by applicantJPS5737852B
 US4235506
 JPH06250100
 JPH0743645
 JPH1020213