Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2916195

EP2916195 - Mobile terminal and controlling method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.04.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.02.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES, GR, HR, LV, RS
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
[2015/37]
Inventor(s)01 / Cho, Jinho
19, Yangjae-daero 11gil, Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-893 / KR
02 / Ka, Hokyung
19, Yangjae-daero 11gil, Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-893 / KR
03 / Jung, Egun
19, Yangjae-daero 11gil, Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-893 / KR
04 / Ahn, Yeongnam
19, Yangjae-daero 11gil, Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-893 / KR
 [2015/37]
Representative(s)Beyer, Andreas
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[2015/37]
Application number, filing date15000437.213.02.2015
[2015/37]
Priority number, dateKR2014002498403.03.2014         Original published format: KR 20140024984
KR2014008173701.07.2014         Original published format: KR 20140081737
[2015/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2916195
Date:09.09.2015
Language:EN
[2015/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2916195
Date:11.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/0482, G06F3/0484, G06F3/0354, G06F1/16, G06F3/0488, H04M1/02
[2019/17]
Former International [2015/37]G06F1/16, H04M1/02, G06F3/0488
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/37]
TitleGerman:Mobiles Endgerät und Steuerungsverfahren dafür[2015/37]
English:Mobile terminal and controlling method thereof[2015/37]
French:Terminal mobile et son procédé de contrôle[2015/37]
Examination procedure13.02.2015Examination requested  [2015/37]
08.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.09.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.01.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.08.2019Fee for grant paid
01.08.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.08.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
21.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES11.09.2019
FI11.09.2019
HR11.09.2019
LT11.09.2019
LV11.09.2019
RS11.09.2019
SE11.09.2019
BG11.12.2019
NO11.12.2019
GR12.12.2019
[2020/11]
Former [2020/10]FI11.09.2019
LT11.09.2019
SE11.09.2019
BG11.12.2019
NO11.12.2019
Former [2020/09]FI11.09.2019
LT11.09.2019
NO11.12.2019
Former [2020/08]LT11.09.2019
NO11.12.2019
Documents cited:Search[XA]US2013300697  (KIM YOUNGRI [KR], et al) [X] 1,9 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0116] - paragraph [0117] * * figure 3 * * figures 19-20 * [A] 2-8,10-15;
 [XAI]US2013176248  (SHIN SEUNGWOO [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,5,9,10,13 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0048] * * figure 6B * [A] 6-8,14,15 [I] 3,4,11,12;
 [XA]US2011175930  (HWANG INYONG [KR], et al) [X] 1,6,9 * paragraph [0123] * * paragraph [0137] * * paragraph [0140] * * figure 2 * * figures 5B-5C * [A] 2-5,7,8,10-15;
 [XA]US2013332870  (KIM SEHO [KR], et al) [X] 1,6-9,14,15 * paragraph [0079] * * paragraph [0140] * * paragraph [0142] - paragraph [0143] * * figure 9B * * figure 10 * [A] 2-5,10-13
ExaminationUS2013111384
 WO2014023118
 US2015109207