Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3032294

EP3032294 - METHOD FOR PREPARING QUANTUM DOT-POLYMER COMPLEX, QUANTUM DOT-POLYMER COMPLEX, LIGHT CONVERSION FILM, BACKLIGHT UNIT AND DISPLAY DEVICE HAVING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.08.2018
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.05.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
[2016/24]
Inventor(s)01 / Sung, Jinwoo
IP Center, LG Electronics Inc., 19, Yangjae-daero
11gil, Seocho-gu
137-893 Seoul / KR
02 / Choi, Moongoo
IP Center, LG Electronics Inc., 19, Yangjae-daero
11gil, Seocho-gu
137-893 Seoul / KR
03 / Shin, Hyunkwon
IP Center, LG Electronics Inc., 19, Yangjae-daero
11gil, Seocho-gu
137-893 Seoul / KR
04 / Jang, Dongseon
IP Center, LG Electronics Inc., 19, Yangjae-daero
11gil, Seocho-gu
137-893 Seoul / KR
 [2016/24]
Representative(s)Frenkel, Matthias Alexander
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[2016/24]
Application number, filing date15001429.812.05.2015
[2016/24]
Priority number, dateKR2014017532508.12.2014         Original published format: KR 20140175325
[2016/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3032294
Date:15.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3032294
Date:25.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.04.2016
ClassificationInternational:G02B1/04
[2016/24]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/27]
Former [2016/24]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DOT-POLYMER-KOMPLEX, QUANTUM-DOT-POLYMER-KOMPLEX, LICHTUMWANDLUNGSFILM, RÜCKBELEUCHTUNGSEINHEIT UND ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG DAMIT[2016/24]
English:METHOD FOR PREPARING QUANTUM DOT-POLYMER COMPLEX, QUANTUM DOT-POLYMER COMPLEX, LIGHT CONVERSION FILM, BACKLIGHT UNIT AND DISPLAY DEVICE HAVING THE SAME[2016/24]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE COMPLEXE DE POLYMÈRES/POINTS QUANTIQUES, COMPLEXE DE POLYMÈRES/POINTS QUANTIQUES, FILM DE CONVERSION DE LUMIÈRE, UNITÉ DE RÉTROÉCLAIRAGE ET DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE DOTÉ DE CELLE-CI[2016/24]
Examination procedure12.05.2015Examination requested  [2016/24]
25.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
07.03.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.09.2017Fee for grant paid
14.09.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.09.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)26.07.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
MC25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SI25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
IE12.05.2018
LU12.05.2018
MT12.05.2018
BE31.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
FR31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
[2020/08]
Former [2019/23]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
MC25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SI25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
IE12.05.2018
LU12.05.2018
BE31.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
FR31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/19]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
MC25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SI25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
IE12.05.2018
LU12.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/17]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
MC25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SI25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
LU12.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/12]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
MC25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SI25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/06]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
MC25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SI25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/52]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SI25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/40]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/39]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/35]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/23]AT25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/22]ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
NO25.01.2018
Former [2018/17]NL25.10.2017
Documents cited:Search[X]KR101463416B  (LMS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-4,7,8,12,14,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0124] - paragraph [0128]; figure 3 * * resin matrix; paragraph [0117] - paragraph [0118] * * Backlight unit; display device;; claims 47-49 *;
 [X]US2012256134  (NICK ROBERT J [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * example 2 *;
 [X]KR20130105544  (UNIV SEJONG IND ACAD COOP GR [KR]) [X] 1-4 * examples 3,5 * * light conversion layer; paragraph [0024] *;
 [P]EP2826836  (UNIV SEJONG IND ACAD COOP GR [KR]);
 [X]EP2584623  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-4 * examples 1,4 * * molecular weight of polymer comprising a plurality of carboxylate anion groups; paragraph [0077] *;
 [X]US2014275431  (FREEMAN WILLIAM P [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0056]; claims 20,1 *
by applicantKR20120035157