Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2960123

EP2960123 - BENDING FRAME FOR EXTENDING THE REGULATING DISTANCE OF AN ACTUATOR FOR A MECHANICALLY ACTUATED COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.04.2018
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.04.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.04.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.12.2019  [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ArianeGroup GmbH
Robert-Koch-Straße 1
82024 Taufkirchen / DE
[2018/09]
Former [2017/23]For all designated states
Airbus DS GmbH
Robert-Koch-Straße 1
82024 Taufkirchen / DE
Former [2016/01]For all designated states
Airbus DS GmbH
Robert-Koch-Straße 1
82024 Taufkirchen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Reith, David
Zuffenhauser Str. 7
D-70825 Korntal / DE
02 / Kraus, Stephan
Brunnenstr. 26
D-74229 Oedheim / DE
03 / Maier, Thomas
Schillerstraße 38
D-74348 Lauffen / DE
 [2016/01]
Representative(s)Frenkel, Matthias Alexander , et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[2017/23]
Former [2016/01]Binder, Karin Meta
Airbus Defence and Space GmbH
Patentabteilung
81663 München / DE
Application number, filing date15001701.009.06.2015
[2016/01]
Priority number, dateDE2014100902524.06.2014         Original published format: DE102014009025
[2016/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2960123
Date:30.12.2015
Language:DE
[2015/53]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2960123
Date:07.06.2017
Language:DE
[2017/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:B60T8/36, F16K31/00, H02N2/04
[2016/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/29]
Former [2016/01]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:BIEGERAHMEN ZUR VERLÄNGERUNG DES STELLWEGS EINES AKTORS FÜR EIN MECHANISCH BETÄTIGTES BAUTEIL[2016/01]
English:BENDING FRAME FOR EXTENDING THE REGULATING DISTANCE OF AN ACTUATOR FOR A MECHANICALLY ACTUATED COMPONENT[2016/01]
French:CADRE DE PLIAGE DESTINÉ À ALLONGER LE PARCOURS DE RÉGLAGE D'UN ACTIONNEUR POUR UN COMPOSANT ACTIONNÉ MÉCANIQUEMENT[2016/01]
Examination procedure07.06.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.06.2016Examination requested  [2016/29]
19.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.12.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.03.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
31.03.2017Fee for grant paid
31.03.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.04.2017Information about intention to grant a patent
27.04.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)08.03.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/20]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU09.06.2015
CY07.06.2017
CZ07.06.2017
DK07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
MC07.06.2017
MK07.06.2017
MT07.06.2017
NL07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
SI07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
IE09.06.2017
LU09.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
IS07.10.2017
[2019/52]
Former [2019/48]HU09.06.2015
CY07.06.2017
CZ07.06.2017
DK07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
MC07.06.2017
MT07.06.2017
NL07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
SI07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
IE09.06.2017
LU09.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
IS07.10.2017
Former [2019/31]HU09.06.2015
CZ07.06.2017
DK07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
MC07.06.2017
MT07.06.2017
NL07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
SI07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
IE09.06.2017
LU09.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
IS07.10.2017
Former [2018/43]CZ07.06.2017
DK07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
MC07.06.2017
MT07.06.2017
NL07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
SI07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
IE09.06.2017
LU09.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
IS07.10.2017
Former [2018/39]CZ07.06.2017
DK07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
MC07.06.2017
NL07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
SI07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
IE09.06.2017
LU09.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
IS07.10.2017
Former [2018/23]CZ07.06.2017
DK07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
MC07.06.2017
NL07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
SI07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
IE09.06.2017
LU09.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
IS07.10.2017
Former [2018/21]CZ07.06.2017
DK07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
MC07.06.2017
NL07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
LU09.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
IS07.10.2017
Former [2018/18]CZ07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
MC07.06.2017
NL07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
IS07.10.2017
Former [2018/11]CZ07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
NL07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
IS07.10.2017
Former [2018/10]CZ07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
NL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
Former [2018/09]EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
NL07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
Former [2017/52]ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
NL07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
Former [2017/50]ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
Former [2017/49]ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
Documents cited:Search[X]DE19854506  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-14 * page 3, line 35 - page 4, line 46; figures 1-3 *;
 [X]DE19817320  (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]; ERPHI ELECTRONIC GMBH [DE]; P & S PROTOTYPEN) [X] 1-14 * column 2, line 33 - column 6, line 7; figures 1, 2 *;
 [X]DE19906467  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-14 * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 39; figure 3 *
ExaminationDE19643180
by applicantDE19643180