Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2962745

EP2962745 - DEVICE FOR FILTERING AND SEPARATING FLOW MEDIA USING MEMBRANES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.07.2016
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
R.T.S. ROCHEM Technical Services GmbH
Knickberg 1a
21077 Hamburg / DE
[2016/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Heine, Wilhelm
Knickberg 1b
21077 Hamburg / DE
 [2016/01]
Representative(s)Niedmers, Ole , et al
Patentanwälte
Niedmers Jaeger Köster
Van-der-Smissen-Strasse 3
22767 Hamburg / DE
[2016/01]
Application number, filing date15001871.111.11.2013
[2016/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2962745
Date:06.01.2016
Language:DE
[2016/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:B01D63/08, B01D63/10
[2016/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/01]
Extension statesBA20.07.2015
ME20.07.2015
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM FILTERN UND TRENNEN VON STRÖMUNGSMEDIEN MITTELS MEMBRANEN[2016/01]
English:DEVICE FOR FILTERING AND SEPARATING FLOW MEDIA USING MEMBRANES[2016/01]
French:DISPOSITIF DE FILTRATION ET DE SEPARATION DE FLUIDES D'ECOULEMENT AU MOYEN DE MEMBRANES[2016/01]
Examination procedure20.07.2015Examination requested  [2016/01]
13.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.07.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.10.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination13.12.2016Appeal received No.  T0485/17
05.01.2017Statement of grounds filed
08.06.2020Date of oral proceedings
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP13005296.2  / EP2870993
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
23.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
28.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
28.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
23.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XI]DE102010027689  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,7-9 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0036]; figures 1-5 * [I] 4
 [Y]US4892657  (MOHN JUERGEN [DE] ET AL) [Y] 1,9-12 * column 7, line 17 - line 50; figure - *
 [XYI]US2013256211  (FLEMING SHAWN P [US]) [X] 1,3,5,9-11 * paragraphs [0011] , [0037] , [0039]; figure 2; claim 2 * [Y] 1,9-12 [I] 4,6
 [XI]WO2004080577  (ZENON ENVIRONMENTAL INC [CA]; HUSAIN HIDAYAT [CA]; COTE PIERRE LUCIEN) [X] 1-3,5,7,8 * paragraph [0037]; figure - * [I] 4
 EP1445013  [ ]
 EP0289740  [ ]
 EP0129663  [ ]