Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2983212

EP2983212 - SOLAR CELL MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.08.2017
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip29.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
[2016/06]
Inventor(s)01 / Lim, Chunghyun
LG Electronics INC. IP Group 51
Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon-gu
153-802 Seoul / KR
02 / Kim, Minpyo
LG Electronics INC. IP Group, 51
Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon-gu
153-802 Seoul / KR
 [2016/06]
Representative(s)Frenkel, Matthias Alexander
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[2016/06]
Application number, filing date15002283.831.07.2015
[2016/06]
Priority number, dateKR2014009971104.08.2014         Original published format: KR 20140099711
KR2015010302521.07.2015         Original published format: KR 20150103025
[2016/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2983212
Date:10.02.2016
Language:EN
[2016/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:H01L31/048, H01L31/05, H01L31/02, H05K3/32
[2016/06]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/38]
Former [2016/06]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:SOLARZELLENMODUL[2016/06]
English:SOLAR CELL MODULE[2016/06]
French:MODULE DE CELLULE SOLAIRE[2016/06]
Examination procedure31.07.2015Examination requested  [2016/06]
09.08.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.08.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.11.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.04.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.07.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
25.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XP]WO2014119252  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [XP] 1,6,8-11,13 * abstract *;
 US2015340543  [ ] (MORIKAWA RYOTA [JP]) [ ] * abstract; paragraphs [0007] , [0 22] - [0030] - [0 34] - [0037] - [0 42]; figures 1-2 *;
 [XI]KR20100123163  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0037] , [0 56] - [0057] - [0 63] , [0 67] , [0 75] - [0096] - [ 103] , [ 105] , [ 117] , [ 143] - paragraphs [0144] , [ 146] * [I] 4,7,14,15;
 [I]US2009255565  (BRITT JEFFREY S [US] ET AL) [I] 1-7,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] , [0 27] , [0 29] - [0038] - [0 41] - [0046] - [0 49] - [0050] *;
 [I]WO2012037191  (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]; DEGROOT MARTY W [US]; MILLS MICHAEL) [I] 1-3,5,8,9,11-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0 29] - [0031] - [0 36] , [0 38] , [0 43] - [0046] - [0 56] , [0 59]; figures 2-5,7,9 *;
 [I]US2009277006  (LI ZHIYONG [US] ET AL) [I] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0036] , [0 41] - [0043] - [0 67] - [0069] - [0 95] - [0102] *;
 [I]US2014213013  (BRITT JEFFREY S [US] ET AL) [I] 1,2,6,8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0063] - [0069] - [0 81] - [0084] - [0 89] *