Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2988565

EP2988565 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRANSMITTING SIGNAL IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.05.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.06.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.02.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  31.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
[2016/08]
Inventor(s)01 / CHAE, Hyukjin
IP Center, LG Electronics Inc., 19, Yangjae-daero
11gil, Seocho-gu
137-893 Seoul / KR
02 / SEO, Hanbyul
IP Center, LG Electronics Inc., 19, Yangjae-daero
11gil, Seocho-gu
137-893 Seoul / KR
03 / KIM, Youngtae
IP Center, LG Electronics Inc., 19, Yangjae-daero
11gil, Seocho-gu
137-893 Seoul / KR
 [2016/08]
Representative(s)Frenkel, Matthias Alexander
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[2016/08]
Application number, filing date15002430.514.08.2015
[2016/08]
Priority number, dateUS201462039437P20.08.2014         Original published format: US 201462039437 P
US201462060565P06.10.2014         Original published format: US 201462060565 P
US201462085640P30.11.2014         Original published format: US 201462085640 P
[2016/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2988565
Date:24.02.2016
Language:EN
[2016/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2988565
Date:04.07.2018
Language:EN
[2018/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.01.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04W72/12, H04W72/02, // H04W88/08
[2018/10]
Former International [2016/08]H04W72/12, H04W72/02, // H04W76/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/34]
Former [2016/08]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR SIGNALÜBERTRAGUNG IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM[2016/08]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRANSMITTING SIGNAL IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM[2016/08]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR LA TRANSMISSION DE SIGNAUX DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL[2016/08]
Examination procedure14.08.2015Examination requested  [2016/08]
12.07.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.02.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.05.2018Fee for grant paid
28.05.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.05.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)05.04.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL04.07.2018
AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
DK04.07.2018
EE04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
IT04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
MC04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RO04.07.2018
RS04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
SI04.07.2018
SK04.07.2018
SM04.07.2018
IE14.08.2018
LU14.08.2018
MT14.08.2018
BE31.08.2018
CH31.08.2018
LI31.08.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
[2020/08]
Former [2019/38]AL04.07.2018
AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
DK04.07.2018
EE04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
IT04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
MC04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RO04.07.2018
RS04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
SI04.07.2018
SK04.07.2018
SM04.07.2018
IE14.08.2018
LU14.08.2018
BE31.08.2018
CH31.08.2018
LI31.08.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/37]AL04.07.2018
AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
DK04.07.2018
EE04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
IT04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
MC04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RO04.07.2018
RS04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
SI04.07.2018
SK04.07.2018
SM04.07.2018
IE14.08.2018
LU14.08.2018
CH31.08.2018
LI31.08.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/33]AL04.07.2018
AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
DK04.07.2018
EE04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
IT04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
MC04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RO04.07.2018
RS04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
SK04.07.2018
SM04.07.2018
IE14.08.2018
LU14.08.2018
CH31.08.2018
LI31.08.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/26]AL04.07.2018
AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
DK04.07.2018
EE04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
IT04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
MC04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RO04.07.2018
RS04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
SK04.07.2018
SM04.07.2018
LU14.08.2018
CH31.08.2018
LI31.08.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/24]AL04.07.2018
AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
EE04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
IT04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
MC04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RO04.07.2018
RS04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
SK04.07.2018
LU14.08.2018
CH31.08.2018
LI31.08.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/22]AL04.07.2018
AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
IT04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RO04.07.2018
RS04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
LU14.08.2018
CH31.08.2018
LI31.08.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/21]AL04.07.2018
AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
IT04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RS04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
LU14.08.2018
CH31.08.2018
LI31.08.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/12]AL04.07.2018
AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RS04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/11]AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RS04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/10]AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RS04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/08]FI04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
NO04.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/07]LT04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
Former [2019/04]NL04.07.2018
Documents cited:Search[A]US2009073929  (MALLADI DURGA PRASAD [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0007] - [0013] * * paragraphs [0031] , [0033] * * paragraphs [0036] - [0048] * * paragraphs [0067] , [0068] , [0072] , [0075] , [0080] , [0082] *
 [Y]  - ALCATEL-LUCENT SHANGHAI BELL ET AL, "Resource allocation and selection for scheduling assignment for D2D communication", vol. RAN WG1, no. Dresden, Germany; 20140818 - 20140822, (20140810), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-143019 - RESOURCE ALLOCATION AND SELECTION FOR SCHEDULING ASSIGNMENT FOR D2D COMMUNICATION_FINAL, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LU, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_78/Docs/, (20140810), XP050815414 [Y] 1-14 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - LG ELECTRONICS, "Remaining issues for D2D physical channel design", vol. RAN WG1, no. Dresden, Germany; 20140818 - 20140822, (20140817), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-143178, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20140817), XP050788655 [Y] 1-14 * Paragraphs 2.1,2.2,3 *
 [A]  - PANASONIC, "Half duplex issue and solutions in D2D", vol. RAN WG1, no. Seoul, Korea; 20140519 - 20140523, (20140518), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-142187, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/RAN1/Docs/, (20140518), XP050789306 [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0002] * * figure 1 *