blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3012800

EP3012800 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE AMOUNT OF PRIMARY ENERGY CONSUMED BY A BUILDING DURING THE YEAR BY A PARTICULAR ENERGY USE TYPE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.03.2018
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.06.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip09.03.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.04.2018  [2018/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ista International GmbH
Grugaplatz 2
45131 Essen / DE
[2016/17]
Inventor(s)01 / ADICK, Jörn
Alfred-Trappen-Straße 18a
44263 Dortmund / DE
02 / MESSERSCHMIDT, Jürgen
Thüringer Straße 4
34314 Espenau / DE
 [2016/17]
Representative(s)Cohausz Hannig Borkowski Wißgott
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Schumannstrasse 97-99
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
[2016/17]
Application number, filing date15002524.526.08.2015
[2016/17]
Priority number, dateDE2014101561623.10.2014         Original published format: DE102014015616
[2016/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3012800
Date:27.04.2016
Language:DE
[2016/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.02.2016
ClassificationIPC:G06Q50/06
[2016/17]
CPC:
G06Q50/06 (EP); G01D4/004 (EP); G01K17/06 (EP);
G06Q30/04 (EP); G01D2204/12 (EP); G01D2204/16 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/49]
Former [2016/17]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER UNTERJÄHRIG DURCH EINE BESTIMMTE ENERGIENUTZUNGSART VERBRAUCHTEN PRIMÄRENERGIE EINER LIEGENSCHAFT[2016/17]
English:METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE AMOUNT OF PRIMARY ENERGY CONSUMED BY A BUILDING DURING THE YEAR BY A PARTICULAR ENERGY USE TYPE[2016/17]
French:PROCEDE DE DETERMINATION DE L'ENERGIE PRIMAIRE D'IMMEUBLES CONSOMMEE EN COURS D'ANNEE PAR UN TYPE DEFINI D'UTILISATION D'ENERGIE[2016/17]
Examination procedure26.08.2015Date on which the examining division has become responsible
27.10.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.10.2016Examination requested  [2016/49]
28.06.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.11.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/15]
06.12.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[I]US2011145611  (LEE KANGWON [KR]) [I] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] - [0073] *;
 [I]WO2012095870  (TATA CONSULTANCY SERVICES LTD [IN], et al) [I] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0017] - [0089] * * figures 2-4 *;
 [I]US2014203949  (BARAS DORIT [IL], et al) [I] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [I]JP2003099502  (OSAKA GAS CO LTD) [I] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [I]JP2010026775  (DAIKIN IND LTD) [I] 1-5 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.