Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3031361 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3031361



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 243
05.12.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
16.02.2018 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
05.01.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
07.12.2017 English translation of the claims Search / examination 2
07.12.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
07.12.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
07.12.2017 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
09.10.2017 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
04.09.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
04.09.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
04.09.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
04.09.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 15
04.09.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 15
18.07.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
18.07.2017 Claims Search / examination 2
18.07.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
17.07.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
17.07.2017 Claims Search / examination 2
17.07.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.06.2017 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
19.06.2017 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.06.2017 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.02.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
17.02.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
17.01.2017 Priority search results Search / examination 5
17.01.2017 Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results Search / examination 1
04.01.2017 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
16.12.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
16.12.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
16.12.2016 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 12
16.12.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 14
16.12.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 12
15.12.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
15.12.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
15.12.2016 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 12
15.12.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 13
15.12.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
23.08.2016 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
23.08.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
20.06.2016 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
19.05.2016 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
14.04.2016 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
14.04.2016 European search opinion Search / examination 3
14.04.2016 European search report Search / examination 2
14.04.2016 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
05.04.2016 Search started Search / examination 1
29.12.2015 Abstract Search / examination 1
29.12.2015 Claims Search / examination 3
29.12.2015 Description Search / examination 12
29.12.2015 Drawings Search / examination 3
29.12.2015 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
12.11.2015 Deficiencies in application documents - annex B and C Search / examination 4
15.10.2015 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
15.10.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
15.10.2015 Priority document Search / examination 19
02.10.2015 Abstract Search / examination 1
02.10.2015 Claims Search / examination 3
02.10.2015 Description Search / examination 12
02.10.2015 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
02.10.2015 Drawings Search / examination 3
02.10.2015 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8