Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3031361

EP3031361 - LYING SURFACE WITH A LOCKING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2016/24]LOCKING ELEMENTS FOR A LYING SURFACE
[2017/36]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.12.2018
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.12.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.09.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Doc AG
Mövenstrasse 8
9015 St. Gallen / CH
[2016/24]
Inventor(s)01 / Kräutle, Martin
Kajetan-Koller Weg 1
D-72379 Hechingen / DE
 [2016/24]
Representative(s)Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60
88113 Lindau / DE
[2016/24]
Application number, filing date15002839.702.10.2015
[2016/24]
Priority number, dateDE20142009869U12.12.2014         Original published format: DE 202014009869 U
[2016/24]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3031361
Date:15.06.2016
Language:DE
[2016/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3031361
Date:31.01.2018
Language:DE
[2018/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.04.2016
ClassificationInternational:A47C20/04
[2016/24]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/39]
Former [2016/24]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBA23.08.2016
TitleGerman:LIEGEFLÄCHE MIT EINEM ARRETIERELEMENT[2017/36]
English:LYING SURFACE WITH A LOCKING ELEMENT[2017/36]
French:SURFACE DE COUCHAGE AVEC UN ÉLEMENT D'ARRET[2017/36]
Former [2016/24]ARRETIERELEMENT FÜR EINE LIEGEFLÄCHE
Former [2016/24]LOCKING ELEMENTS FOR A LYING SURFACE
Former [2016/24]ÉLEMENT D'ARRET POUR UNE SURFACE DE COUCHAGE
Examination procedure23.08.2016Examination requested  [2016/39]
15.12.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05)
17.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.09.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.10.2017Fee for grant paid
09.10.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.12.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)02.11.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2019/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
MC31.01.2018
MT31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SI31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
SM31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
IE02.10.2018
LU02.10.2018
FR31.10.2018
[2019/48]
Former [2019/38]AL31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
MC31.01.2018
MT31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SI31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
SM31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
LU02.10.2018
FR31.10.2018
Former [2019/30]AL31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
MC31.01.2018
MT31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SI31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
SM31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
LU02.10.2018
Former [2019/28]AL31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
MC31.01.2018
MT31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SI31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
SM31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2019/13]AL31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
MT31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SI31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
SM31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/52]AL31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
MT31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
SM31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/51]AL31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
MT31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/50]AL31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
MT31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/47]AL31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
MT31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/46]AL31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
MT31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/43]ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
MT31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/40]ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/39]ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/36]ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
NO30.04.2018
Former [2018/35]FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
NO30.04.2018
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE10018567  (ROESSLE & WANNER GMBH) [X] 1,2,8 * paragraphs [0018] , [0027]; figure - * [A] 9-11;
 [XA]DE2355251  (INPAVER AG) [X] 1-3,5,8 * page 8, paragraph 3; figure -; claim 6 * [A] 9-11;
 [XA]FR1311933  (DUBOIS) [X] 1-3,5,8 * page 2, column 2; figure - * [A] 9-11;
 [X]US662487  (DONALDSON WILLIAM H [US]) [X] 1-3,5,8 * figure - *;
 [X]DE202006010820U  (HETTICH FRANKE GMBH & CO KG) [X] 1,9,10 * paragraph [0027]; figure -; claim - *;
 [X]DE20104961U  (FRANKE GMBH & CO KG) [X] 1,9 * figure -; claim 1 *
ExaminationGB190624954
 US2012043770