Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3047929

EP3047929 - MINIATURISED DEBURRING AND/OR CHAMFERING TOOL WITH INTERNAL COOLING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.07.2018
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.11.2018New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HEULE Werkzeug AG
Wegenstraße 11
9436 Balgach / CH
[2016/30]
Inventor(s)01 / Studer, Harry
Strimäderstrasse 8
9436 Balgach / CH
02 / Fässler, Roman
Eggerstrasse 9f
9437 Marbach / CH
 [2016/30]
Representative(s)Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt
Postfach 31 60
88113 Lindau/B. / DE
[2016/30]
Application number, filing date15002944.515.10.2015
[2016/30]
Priority number, dateDE2015100079722.01.2015         Original published format: DE102015000797
[2016/30]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3047929
Date:27.07.2016
Language:DE
[2016/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:B23B51/06, B23B51/10
[2018/30]
Former International [2016/30]B23D79/02, B23Q11/10, B23B51/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/44]
Former [2016/30]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:MINIATURISIERTES ENTGRAT- UND/ODER FASWERKZEUG MIT INNENKÜHLUNG[2016/30]
English:MINIATURISED DEBURRING AND/OR CHAMFERING TOOL WITH INTERNAL COOLING[2016/30]
French:OUTIL D'EBAVURAGE ET/OU DE CHANFREINAGE MINIATURISÉ AVEC REFROIDISSEMENT INTERNE[2018/30]
Former [2016/30]OUTIL D'ÉBAVURAGE ET/OU DE CHANFREINAGE MINIATURISÉ AVEC REFROIDISSEMENT INTERNE
Examination procedure21.09.2016Examination requested  [2016/44]
19.12.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
30.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[YD]DE10333194  (HEULE ULF [CH]) [YD] 1-10 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0051] * * figures 1-5 *;
 [Y]EP2589451  (HEULE ULF [CH]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0091] * * figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US6238150  (YAMADA JUN [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 7, line 8 - column 15, line 43 * * figures 1-16 *;
 [A]WO2013135383  (ULF HEULE [CH]) [A] 1 * page 11, line 30 - page 25, line 5 * * figures 1-22 *
by applicantDE10333194
 US5927911
 DE10215004
 WO9605928
 DE102008004648
 DE29519893U
 DE102008046489