Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3119067

EP3119067 - CLIENT-SERVER SYSTEM FOR NETWORK SERVICES AND APPLICATIONS FOR MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS TERMINALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.07.2018
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.02.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.05.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  16.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2018New entry: Payment of fee for grant 
21.09.2018New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Opencode Systems O.O.D.
J.K.Hippodruma Bl.1, Ap.4
1612 Sofia / BG
[2017/03]
Inventor(s)01 / Staykoff, Constantin
c/o Opencode Systems O.O.D.
J.K. Hippodruma
Bl.1, Ap.4
1612 Sofia / BG
 [2017/03]
Application number, filing date15003603.603.03.2016
[2017/03]
Priority number, dateUS20151459212408.01.2015         Original published format: US201514592124
[2017/03]
Previously filed application, dateUS20141459212408.01.2014
[2017/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3119067
Date:18.01.2017
Language:EN
[2017/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.12.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04M3/42, H04M7/00, H04L29/08
[2017/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/24]
Former [2017/03]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:CLIENT-SERVER-SYSTEM FÜR NETZWERKDIENSTE UND ANWENDUNGEN FÜR MOBILTELEKOMMUNIKATIONSENDGERÄTE[2017/03]
English:CLIENT-SERVER SYSTEM FOR NETWORK SERVICES AND APPLICATIONS FOR MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS TERMINALS[2017/03]
French:SYSTÈME CLIENT-SERVEUR POUR DES SERVICES DE RÉSEAU ET APPLICATIONS POUR DES TERMINAUX DE TÉLÉCOMMUNICATIONS MOBILES[2017/03]
Examination procedure17.12.2015Date on which the examining division has become responsible
05.05.2017Examination requested  [2017/24]
10.07.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.05.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.07.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.09.2018Fee for grant paid
17.09.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
Request for re-establishment of rights:03.03.2016Date of receipt
27.10.2016Request accepted
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[I]US2012099571  (STAYKOFF CONSTANTIN [BG]) [I] 1-18 * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0123] - paragraph [0146] *;
 [I]US2012089674  (STAYKOFF CONSTANTIN [BG]) [I] 1-18 * abstract * * figures 1-5 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0034] *;
 [A]  - ANONYMOUS, "Redefining over-the-phone customer service", INTERNET CITATION, (20080331), pages 1 - 8, URL: http://www.voiceobjects.com/files/en/voiceobjects_7_product_brief_en.pdf, (20090511), XP002528244 [A] 1-18 * the whole document *