Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3119067 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3119067



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 614
08.11.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
22.10.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
22.10.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 8
22.10.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 8
19.07.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
19.07.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
19.07.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
19.07.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 50
19.07.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 50
31.05.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 9
31.05.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 9
31.05.2018 Claims Search / examination 7
31.05.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
09.02.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
09.02.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
05.02.2018 Annex Search / examination 2
01.02.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
10.07.2017 Abstract Search / examination 1
10.07.2017 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 7
10.07.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 11
10.07.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 11
10.07.2017 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 36
10.07.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 39
10.07.2017 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 8
23.01.2017 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
21.12.2016 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
20.12.2016 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
20.12.2016 European search opinion Search / examination 4
20.12.2016 European search report Search / examination 2
20.12.2016 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
12.12.2016 Search started Search / examination 1
28.11.2016 General enquiry Search / examination 2
28.11.2016 General enquiry Search / examination 2
23.11.2016 Abstract Search / examination 1
23.11.2016 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
23.11.2016 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
27.10.2016 Request for re-establishment of rights allowed Search / examination 1
31.08.2016 Request for re-establishment of rights Search / examination 1
14.07.2016 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
25.04.2016 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
11.04.2016 Accordance of a filing date Search / examination 1
11.04.2016 Loss of priority right Search / examination 2
23.03.2016 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 70
03.03.2016 Annex Search / examination 12
03.03.2016 Annex Search / examination 5
03.03.2016 Claims Search / examination 8
03.03.2016 Declaration for SMEs Search / examination 1
03.03.2016 Description Search / examination 38
03.03.2016 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
03.03.2016 Drawings Search / examination 7
03.03.2016 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
03.03.2016 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
03.03.2016 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
03.03.2016 Non-scannable object Search / examination 1
03.03.2016 Previously filed application Search / examination 70
03.03.2016 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 9
03.03.2016 Request for re-establishment of rights Search / examination 1
03.03.2016 US-Priority document (transmitted on CD) Search / examination 1
03.03.2016 US-Priority document (transmitted on CD) Search / examination 69
19.02.2016 Invitation to remedy deficiencies for the accordance of the filing date Search / examination 2
17.12.2015 Declaration for SMEs Search / examination 1
17.12.2015 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
17.12.2015 Information of the Post Room regarding missing documents Search / examination 1
17.12.2015 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
17.12.2015 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
17.12.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
17.12.2015 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 9