Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3119067


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
02.11.2018 (Expected) grant published on  05.12.2018 [2018/49]
30.10.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
21.09.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
21.09.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
18.07.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
10.07.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
10.07.2018 Deletion: Communication of intention to grant a patent
05.06.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
09.03.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.02.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
09.02.2018 First examination report
28.07.2017 Amendment by applicant
12.05.2017 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible has been established
12.05.2017 Request for examination filed published on  14.06.2017  [2017/24]
12.05.2017 Change - designated states published on  14.06.2017  [2017/24]
16.12.2016 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  18.01.2017  [2017/03]
20.04.2016 Deletion: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit
10.04.2016 New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit