Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP3119067

Designated contracting statesAL 
AT 
BE 
BG 
CH 
CY 
CZ 
DE 
DK 
EE 
ES 
FI 
FR 
GB 
GR 
HR 
HU 
IE 
IS 
IT 
LI 
LT 
LU 
LV 
MC 
MK 
MT 
NL 
NO 
PL 
PT 
RO 
RS 
SE 
SI 
SK 
SM 
TR 
Validation statesMA 
MD 
Examination procedure17.09.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:18.01.2017 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:BA ME
 
Event date:18.01.2017 
Event description:REQUEST FOR VALIDATION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT IN:
Countries concerned:MA MD
 
Event date:18.01.2017 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:14.06.2017 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20170505
 
Event date:14.06.2017 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:14.03.2018 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT
Effective DATE:20180209
 
Event date:15.08.2018 
Event description:ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT
Effective DATE:20180719