blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3040144 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3040144



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 170
09.08.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
09.08.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
09.08.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
09.08.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 25
09.08.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 23
03.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
03.07.2019 Claims Search / examination 6
03.07.2019 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
13.03.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
13.03.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
06.03.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
20.12.2018 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.12.2018 Enquiry as to the processing of the file Search / examination 1
04.12.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
31.10.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
31.10.2016 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
25.10.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
29.09.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
26.09.2016 Notification of termination of representative's authorisation Search / examination 1
19.08.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
11.07.2016 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
08.06.2016 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
04.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.04.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 7
04.04.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
04.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.10.2015 Abstract Search / examination 1
22.10.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 7
22.10.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 12
22.10.2015 Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
01.07.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
01.07.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 3
01.07.2015 European search report Search / examination 2
18.06.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
23.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.02.2015 Abstract Search / examination 1
23.02.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.02.2015 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
02.02.2015 Deficiencies in application documents - annex A Search / examination 3
05.01.2015 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
05.01.2015 Claims Search / examination 7
05.01.2015 Description Search / examination 12
05.01.2015 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
05.01.2015 Drawings Search / examination 4
05.01.2015 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5