blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3040144


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
08.08.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
08.07.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
08.03.2019 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
08.03.2019 First examination report
02.02.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.02.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.02.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.11.2016 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible has been established
04.11.2016 Request for examination filed published on  07.12.2016  [2016/49]
04.11.2016 Change - designated states published on  07.12.2016  [2016/49]
21.10.2016 Change - representative
21.09.2016 Change - representative
03.06.2016 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  06.07.2016  [2016/27]
06.04.2016 Amendment by applicant
23.10.2015 Amendment by applicant
06.01.2015 Change - representative