blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3040144 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201610001454 EP15150064



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US2016193665Global Dossier 07.07.2016A1
Priority number Date
EP15150064 05.01.2015
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2016128203Global Dossier 14.07.2016A
Priority number Date
EP15150064 05.01.2015
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN105750578BGlobal Dossier 08.01.2019B
CN105750578 13.07.2016A
Priority number Date
EP15150064 05.01.2015
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP3040144Global Dossier 06.07.2016A1
Priority number Date
EP15150064 05.01.2015