Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3040144

EP3040144 - Clamping device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.08.2019
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.03.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip08.08.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MTH GbR Markus und Thomas Hiestand
Äußerer Mühlweg 2
88630 Pfullendorf / DE
[2016/27]
Inventor(s)01 / Hiestand, Karl
Äußerer Mühlweg 2
88630 Pfullendorf / DE
 [2016/27]
Representative(s)Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt Dr.-Ing. Peter Riebling Postfach 3160
88113 Lindau / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/27]Engelhardt & Engelhardt
Patentanwälte Montafonstraße 35
88045 Friedrichshafen / DE
Application number, filing date15150064.205.01.2015
[2016/27]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3040144
Date:06.07.2016
Language:DE
[2016/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:B23B31/28, B23B31/175
[2016/27]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/49]
Former [2016/27]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Spanneinrichtung[2016/27]
English:Clamping device[2016/27]
French:Dispositif de serrage[2016/27]
Examination procedure05.01.2015Date on which the examining division has become responsible
04.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.10.2016Examination requested  [2016/49]
13.03.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.07.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.08.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
30.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
30.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP2384839  (HIESTAND KARL [DE]) [X] 1,3,6,7 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0038] * * figures 1-5 * [I] 2,4,5,8-18;
 [X]DE4015261  (GEDIB INGBUERO INNOVATION [DE]) [X] 1 * column 7, line 31 - column 13, line 35 * * figures 1-2 *;
 [A]DE3218083  (BALD HUBERT) [A] 1 * page 12, line 14 - page 19, line 21 * * figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US2002162409  (ITO HIDENOBU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0094] - paragraph [0333]; figures 1-16 *
by applicantEP2548681