blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2894883


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
27.06.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
22.05.2019 Change: Reply to examination report
22.05.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
25.02.2019 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
01.02.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.11.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
02.11.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
28.08.2018 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
07.05.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
27.04.2018 First examination report
31.01.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.02.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.01.2016 Change - designated states published on  24.02.2016  [2016/08]
22.01.2016 Change - request for examination published on  24.02.2016  [2016/08]
16.01.2016 Amendment by applicant
06.10.2015 Change - representative
14.07.2015 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  15.07.2015  [2015/29]
12.06.2015 Request for examination filed published on  15.07.2015  [2015/29]
15.01.2015 Change - representative