Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2894883

EP2894883 - Methods and systems for content consumption [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.06.2019
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Comcast Cable Communications, LLC
1701 JFK Boulevard
Philadelphia, PA 19103 / US
[2015/29]
Inventor(s)01 / Larkin, Andrew
4730 Pine Street, Apt. D3
Philadelphia, PA Pennsylvania 19143 / US
02 / Athias, Franklyn
46 Southwood Drive
Cherry Hill, NJ New Jersey 08003 / US
 [2015/29]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2015/29]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date15150686.209.01.2015
[2015/29]
Priority number, dateUS20141415146709.01.2014         Original published format: US201414151467
[2015/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2894883
Date:15.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.04.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W4/02, H04L29/08, H04W4/00, H04W52/02
[2015/29]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/08]
Former [2015/29]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Systeme für Inhaltsverbrauch[2015/29]
English:Methods and systems for content consumption[2015/29]
French:Procédés et systèmes de consommation de contenu[2015/29]
Examination procedure14.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.01.2016Examination requested  [2016/08]
26.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.11.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.05.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.06.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
29.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
28.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP2387202  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1,3-6 * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0084] * * paragraph [0096] * * paragraph [0127] * * paragraph [0151] * * figures 1,7 * [Y] 2,10,11,13;
 [IY]US2013111039  (GOMES CONRAD SAVIO JUDE [IN]) [I] 1,5,7,8,12,14 * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0046] * [Y] 9-11,13,15;
 [Y]US2006046709  (KRUMM JOHN C [US] ET AL) [Y] 2,9,15 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0055] *;
 [A]US2013157568  (JAIN ANAND [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0040] *;
 [A]US2008039058  (RAY RAJARSHI [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0075] *