Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2939940

EP2939940 - Package for storing a product [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.08.2017
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Braun GmbH
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg / DE
[2015/45]
Inventor(s)01 / Kobbe, Manfred
P&G Manufacturing GmbH
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg/Taunus / DE
 [2015/45]
Representative(s)Töpert, Verena Clarita
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Sulzbacher Straße 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/45]Töpert, Verena Clarita
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
Patent Department
Frankfurter Str. 145
61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE
Application number, filing date15151067.414.01.2015
[2015/45]
Priority number, dateEP2014016643529.04.2014         Original published format: EP 14166435
[2015/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2939940
Date:04.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2939940
Date:05.10.2016
Language:EN
[2016/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.04.2015
ClassificationInternational:B65D5/20, B65D5/66
[2015/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/23]
Former [2015/45]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verpackung zur Aufbewahrung eines Produkts[2015/45]
English:Package for storing a product[2015/45]
French:Emballage permettant de stocker un produit[2015/45]
Examination procedure28.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.04.2016Examination requested  [2016/23]
17.06.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.08.2016Fee for grant paid
23.08.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.08.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)06.07.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/37]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.01.2015
AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
CY05.10.2016
CZ05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
EE05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
IT05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
MC05.10.2016
MK05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SI05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
SM05.10.2016
BG05.01.2017
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IE14.01.2017
LU14.01.2017
MT14.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
[2019/52]
Former [2019/47]HU14.01.2015
AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
CY05.10.2016
CZ05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
EE05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
IT05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
MC05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SI05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
SM05.10.2016
BG05.01.2017
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IE14.01.2017
LU14.01.2017
MT14.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
Former [2019/31]HU14.01.2015
AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
CZ05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
EE05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
IT05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
MC05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SI05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
SM05.10.2016
BG05.01.2017
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IE14.01.2017
LU14.01.2017
MT14.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
Former [2018/43]AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
CZ05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
EE05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
IT05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
MC05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SI05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
SM05.10.2016
BG05.01.2017
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IE14.01.2017
LU14.01.2017
MT14.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
Former [2018/13]AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
CZ05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
EE05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
IT05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
MC05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SI05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
SM05.10.2016
BG05.01.2017
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IE14.01.2017
LU14.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
Former [2017/52]AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
CZ05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
EE05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
IT05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
MC05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SI05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
SM05.10.2016
BG05.01.2017
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
LU14.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
Former [2017/42]AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
CZ05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
EE05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
IT05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
MC05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
SM05.10.2016
BG05.01.2017
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
Former [2017/38]AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
CZ05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
EE05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
IT05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
SM05.10.2016
BG05.01.2017
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
Former [2017/37]AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
CZ05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
EE05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
IT05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
SM05.10.2016
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
Former [2017/36]AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
CZ05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
EE05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
Former [2017/34]AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
CZ05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
Former [2017/33]AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
Former [2017/26]AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
Former [2017/12]LV05.10.2016
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2695097  (EASTON EDWARD F) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP1323635  (RONDO AG [CH]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0021]; figures 1-7 *;
 [Y]US2005252809  (ALDRIDGE ALLEN S [US] ET AL) [Y] 15 * paragraph [0055] *;
 [A]EP2112078  (DIVIDELLA AG [CH]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-12 *