Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2896997

EP2896997 - Liquid toner dispersion and use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.07.2018
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.08.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 24.07.2019  [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Xeikon Manufacturing NV
Duwijckstraat 17
2500 Lier / BE
[2017/24]
Former [2015/30]For all designated states
Xeikon IP BV
Brieversstraat 70
4529 GZ Eede / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Deprez, Lode, Erik, Dries
Stationstraat 199d
9185 WACHTEBEKE / BE
02 / Op De Beeck, Werner, Jozef, Johan
Zwitserstraat 7a
2580 PUTTE / BE
03 / Deroover, Geert, Gaston, Paul
Stijn Streuvelslaan 20
2500 LIER / BE
 [2015/30]
Representative(s)Nollen, Maarten Dirk-Johan , et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
[2015/30]
Application number, filing date15151096.314.01.2015
[2015/30]
Priority number, dateNL2014201211521.01.2014         Original published format: NL 2012115
[2015/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2896997
Date:22.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2896997
Date:06.09.2017
Language:EN
[2017/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:G03G9/125, G03G9/135
[2015/30]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/09]
Former [2015/30]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Flüssigtonerdispersion und Verwendung davon[2015/30]
English:Liquid toner dispersion and use thereof[2015/30]
French:Dispersion de toner liquide et son utilisation[2015/30]
Examination procedure15.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.01.2016Examination requested  [2016/09]
12.04.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.06.2017Fee for grant paid
13.06.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.08.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)07.06.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT06.09.2017
CZ06.09.2017
DK06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
IT06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
MC06.09.2017
NL06.09.2017
PL06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
SI06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
SM06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
IS06.01.2018
IE14.01.2018
LU14.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
[2019/30]
Former [2019/09]AT06.09.2017
CZ06.09.2017
DK06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
IT06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
NL06.09.2017
PL06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
SI06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
SM06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
IS06.01.2018
IE14.01.2018
LU14.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
Former [2018/52]AT06.09.2017
CZ06.09.2017
DK06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
IT06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
NL06.09.2017
PL06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
SI06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
SM06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
IS06.01.2018
LU14.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
Former [2018/50]AT06.09.2017
CZ06.09.2017
DK06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
IT06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
NL06.09.2017
PL06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
SI06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
SM06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
IS06.01.2018
LU14.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
Former [2018/47]AT06.09.2017
CZ06.09.2017
DK06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
IT06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
NL06.09.2017
PL06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
SI06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
SM06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
IS06.01.2018
LU14.01.2018
Former [2018/40]AT06.09.2017
CZ06.09.2017
DK06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
IT06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
NL06.09.2017
PL06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
SI06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
SM06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
IS06.01.2018
Former [2018/35]AT06.09.2017
CZ06.09.2017
DK06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
IT06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
NL06.09.2017
PL06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
SM06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
IS06.01.2018
Former [2018/24]AT06.09.2017
CZ06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
IT06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
NL06.09.2017
PL06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
SM06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
IS06.01.2018
Former [2018/23]AT06.09.2017
CZ06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
NL06.09.2017
PL06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
IS06.01.2018
Former [2018/21]CZ06.09.2017
ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
NL06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
Former [2018/15]ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
NL06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
Former [2018/12]ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
Former [2018/11]ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
Former [2018/09]FI06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
NO06.12.2017
Former [2018/08]FI06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
NO06.12.2017
Former [2018/07]LT06.09.2017
NO06.12.2017
Documents cited:Search[I]US2007258731  (IKUMA K; IKUMA T; KAIHO H; MIURA S) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0074] * * figure 1 * * claims 1-12 *;
 [I]US2008131807  (TESHIMA TAKASHI [JP] ET AL) [I] 1-15 * claims 1-9 * * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0077] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0062] *;
 [I]US2008124645  (YAMANAKA SHUNICHIRO [JP] ET AL) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0095]; claims 1-13 *
by applicantUS2011249990
 US2007258731
 EP1120647
 NL20132011955
 NL20142012086
 NL20132010581
 EP20130162577
 NL20132011381
 EP20120186676