Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2889033

EP2889033 - Treatment of negative symptoms of schizophrenia with (R)-7-chloro-N-(quinuclidin-3-yl)benzo[b]thiophene-2-carboxamide and pharmaceutically acceptable salts thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.01.2019
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.02.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.09.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip25.01.2019No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.02.2019  [2019/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Forum Pharmaceuticals Inc.
225 Second Avenue
Waltham, MA 02451 / US
[2015/33]
Former [2015/27]For all designated states
Forum Pharmaceuticals Inc.
500 Arsenal Street
Watertown, MA 02472 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Koenig, Gerhard
1662 Commonwealth Ave.
Newton, MA Massachusetts 02465 / US
02 / Chesworth, Richard
88 Kingston Stree Unit 5F
Boston, MA Massachusetts 02111 / US
03 / Shapiro, Gideon
5507 NW 80th Avenue
Gainsville, FL Florida 32653 / US
 [2015/27]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2018/12]
Former [2015/27]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date15151165.619.11.2009
[2015/27]
Priority number, dateUS20080116106P19.11.2008         Original published format: US 116106 P
[2015/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2889033
Date:01.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2889033
Date:21.03.2018
Language:EN
[2018/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.04.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/439, A61P25/00
[2015/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/27]
TitleGerman:Behandlung von negativen Symptomen der Schizophrenie mit (R)-7-Chlor-N-(quinuclidin-3-yl)benzo[b]thiophen-2-carboxamid und pharmazeutisch verträgliche Salze davon[2017/36]
English:Treatment of negative symptoms of schizophrenia with (R)-7-chloro-N-(quinuclidin-3-yl)benzo[b]thiophene-2-carboxamide and pharmaceutically acceptable salts thereof[2015/27]
French:Traitement de symptômes négatifs de la schizophrénie avec (R)-7-chloro-N-(quinuclidin-3-yl)benzo[b]thiophene-2-carboxamide et leurs sels pharmaceutiquement acceptables[2015/27]
Former [2015/27]Behandlung von negativen Symptomen der Schizophrenie mit (R)-7-chlor-N-(quinuclidin-3-yl)benzo[b]thiophen-2-carboxamid und pharmazeutisch verträgliche Salze davon
Examination procedure14.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/27]
22.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.05.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.09.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.01.2018Fee for grant paid
19.01.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.01.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP09756921.4  / EP2355822
EP12185913.6  / EP2540297
Divisional application(s)EP18152484.4  / EP3357495
Opposition(s)02.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
14.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
14.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
14.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
29.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
15.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
07.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201709   M06   Fee paid on   07.02.2018
Documents cited:Search[AD]WO03055878  (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [AD] 1-8 * page 19, line 1 - page 20, line 4 * * page 26, lines 1-3 * * example 69 * * claims 12-15 *;
 [A]  - ACKER BRAD A ET AL, "Discovery of N-[(3R,5R)-1-azabicyclo[3.2.1]oct-3-yl]furo[2,3-c]pyridi ne-5-carboxamide as an agonist of the alpha 7 nicotinic acetylcholine receptor: In vitro and in vivo activity", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (200806), vol. 18, no. 12, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 3611 - 3615, XP002572658 [A] 1-8 * abstract * * page 3611, column 1, paragraph 1 - column 2, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2008.04.070
 [A]  - WISHKA DONN G ET AL, "Discovery of N-[(3R)-1-azabicyclo[2.2.2]oct-3-yl]furo[2,3-c]pyridine- 5-carboxamide, an agonist of the alpha 7 nicotinic acetylcholine receptor, for the potential treatment of cognitive deficits in schizophrenia: Synthesis and structure-activity relationship", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (200607), vol. 49, no. 14, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 4425 - 4436, XP002572659 [A] 1-8 * abstract * * page 4425, column 1, paragraph 1 - column 2, paragraph 1 * * table 1 * * page 4428, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 4429, column 1, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm0602413
 [A]  - GRAY J A ET AL, "The pipeline and future of drug development in schizophrenia.", MOLECULAR PSYCHIATRY OCT 2007, (200710), vol. 12, no. 10, ISSN 1359-4184, pages 904 - 922, XP002572660 [A] 1-8 * abstract * * page 905, column 1, paragraph 5 - column 2, paragraph 4 * * see alpha nAChR, and PNU 282987 in Table 1; page 907, lines 11-14 * * table 3 * * page 913, column 1, paragraph 4 - column 2, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.mp.4002062
 [A]  - FREEDMAN ROBERT ET AL, "Initial Phase 2 Trial of a Nicotinic Agonist in Schizophrenia", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PSYCHIATRY, (200808), vol. 165, no. 8, doi:10.1176/appi.ajp.2008.07071135, ISSN 0002-953X, pages 1040 - 1047, XP055182228 [A] 1-8 * abstract * * tables 1-2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1176/appi.ajp.2008.07071135
by applicantWO03055878
    - ADLER, L.E.; HOFFER, L.D.; WISER, A.; FREEDMAN, R., "Normalization of auditory physiology by cigarette smoking in schizophrenic patients", AM J PSYCHIATRY, (1993), vol. 150, pages 1856 - 1861, XP001062599
    - ADLER, L.E.; OLINCY, A.; WALDO, M.; HARRIS, J.G.; GRIFFITH, J.; STEVENS, K.; FLACH, K.; NAGAMOTO, H.; BICKFORD, P.; LEONARD, S., "Schizophrenia, sensory gating, and nicotinic receptors", SCHIZOPHR BULL, (1998), vol. 24, pages 189 - 202
    - BALDEWEG, T.; WONG, D.; STEPHAN, K.E., "Nicotinic modulation of human auditory sensory memory: Evidence from mismatch negativity potentials", INT J PSYCHOPHYSIOL, (2006), vol. 59, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ijpsycho.2005.07.014, pages 49 - 58, XP024954070

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijpsycho.2005.07.014
    - BOUTROS, N.N.; OVERALL, J.; ZOURIDAKIS, G., "Test-retest reliability of the P50 mid-latency auditory evoked response", PSYCHIATRY RES, (1991), vol. 39, pages 181 - 192
    - DALEBOUT, S.D.; FOX, L.G., "Reliability of the mismatch negativity in the responses of individual listeners", J AM ACAD AUDIOL, (2001), vol. 12, pages 245 - 253
    - DE WILDE, O.M.; BOUR, L.J.; DINGEMANS, P.M.; KOELMAN, J.H.; LINSZEN, D.H., "A meta-analysis of P50 studies in patients with schizophrenia and relatives: differences in methodology between research groups", SCHIZOPHR RES, (2007), vol. 97, doi:doi:10.1016/j.schres.2007.04.028, pages 137 - 151, XP022344543

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.schres.2007.04.028
    - DIERKS, T.; FROLICH, L.; IHL, R.; MAURER, K., "Event-related potentials and psychopharmacology. Cholinergic modulation ofP300", PHARMAEOPSYCHIATRY, (1994), vol. 27, pages 72 - 74
    - DUNBAR, G.; BOEIJINGA, P.H.; DEMAZIERES, A.; CISTERNI, C.; KUCHIBHATLA, R.; WESNES, K.; LUTHRINGER, R., "Effects ofTC-1734 (AZD3480), a selective neuronal nicotinic receptor agonist, on cognitive performance and the EEG of young healthy male volunteers", PSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY (BERL, (2007), vol. 191, doi:doi:10.1007/s00213-006-0675-x, pages 919 - 929, XP019488596

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00213-006-0675-x
    - DUNCAN, E.; MADONICK, S.; CHAKRAVORTY, S.; PARWANI, A.; SZILAGYI, S.; EFFEREN, T.; GONZENBACH, S.; ANGRIST, B.; ROTROSEN, J, "Effects of smoking on acoustic startle and prepulse inhibition in humans", PSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY (BERL, (2001), vol. 156, pages 266 - 272
    - EASTON, C.J.; BAUER, L.O., "Beneficial effects of thiamine on recognition memory and P300 in abstinent cocaine-dependent patients", PSYCHIATRY RES, (1997), vol. 70, pages 165 - 174
    - FREEDMAN, R.; LEONARD, S.; GAULT, J.M.; HOPKINS, J.; CLONINGER, C.R.; KAUFMANN, C.A.; TSUANG, M.T.; FARONE, S.V.; MALASPINA, D.; S, "Linkage disequilibrium for schizophrenia at the chromosome 15q13-14 locus of the alpha7-nicotinic acetylcholine receptor subunit gene (CHRNA7", AM J MED GENET, (2001), vol. 105, pages 20 - 22
    - FUERST, D.R.; GALLINAT, J.; BOUTROS, N.N., "Range of sensory gating values and test-retest reliability in normal subjects", PSYCHOPHYSIOLOGY, (2007), vol. 44, pages 620 - 626
    - HEINRICHS, R.W., "Meta-analysis and the science of schizophrenia: variant evidence or evidence of variants?", NEUROSCI BIOBEHAV REV, (2004), vol. 28, pages 379 - 394
    - KAGA, K.; HARRISON, J.B.; BUTCHER, L.L.; WOOLF, N.J.; BUCHWALD, J.S., "Cat 'P300' and cholinergic septohippocampal neurons: depth recordings, lesions, and choline acetyltransferase immunohistochemistry", NEUROSCI RES, (1992), vol. 13, doi:doi:10.1016/0168-0102(92)90034-A, pages 53 - 71, XP024336835

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-0102(92)90034-A
    - KATADA, E.; SATO, K.; SAWAKI, A.; DOHI, Y.; UEDA, R.; OJIKA, K., "Long-term effects of donepezil on P300 auditory event-related potentials in patients with Alzheimer's disease", J GERIATR PSYCHIATRY NEUROL, (2003), vol. 16, pages 39 - 43
    - MAURER, T.; DEBARTOLO, D.; TESS, D.; SCOTT, D., "The relationship between the exposure and non-specific binding of thirty-three central nervous system drugs in mice", DRUG METABOLISM AND DISPOSITION, (2005), vol. 33, pages 175 - 181
    - NAATANEN, R.; ALHO, K., "Generators of electrical and magnetic mismatch responses in humans", BRAIN TOPOGR, (1995), vol. 7, pages 315 - 320
    - OLINCY, A.; HARRIS, J.G.; JOHNSON, L.L.; PENDER, V.; KONGS, S.; ALLENSWORTH, D.; ELLIS, J.; ZERBE, G.O.; LEONARD, S.; STEVENS, K.E, "Proof-of-concept trial of an alpha7 nicotinic agonist in schizophrenia", ARCH GEN PSYCHIATRY, (2006), vol. 63, pages 630 - 638, XP009130792
    - POTTER, D.; SUMMERFELT, A.; GOLD, J.; BUCHANAN, R.W., "Review of clinical correlates of P50 sensory gating abnormalities in patients with schizophrenia", SCHIZOPHR BULL, (2006), vol. 32, pages 692 - 700
    - SANDMAN, C.A.; PATTERSON, J.V., "The auditory event-related potential is a stable and reliable measure in elderly subjects over a 3 year period", CLIN NEUROPHYSIOL, (2000), vol. 111, doi:doi:10.1016/S1388-2457(00)00320-5, pages 1427 - 1437, XP085045508

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1388-2457(00)00320-5
    - SCHALL, U.; JOHNSTON, P.; TODD, J.; WARD, P.B.; MICHIE, P.T., "Functional neuroanatomy of auditory mismatch processing: an event-related fMRI study of duration-deviant oddballs", NEUROIMAGE, (2003), vol. 20, pages 729 - 736
    - TRAINOR, G, "The importance of plasma protein binding in drug discovery", EXPERT OPINION IN DRUG DISCOVERY, (2007), vol. 2, doi:doi:10.1517/17460441.2.1.51, pages 51 - 64, XP055325244

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/17460441.2.1.51
    - TURETSKY, B.I.; CALKINS, M.E.; LIGHT, G.A.; OLINCY, A.; RADANT, A.D.; SWERDLOW, N.R., "Neurophysiological endophenotypes of schizophrenia: the viability of selected candidate measures", SCHIZOPHR BULL, (2007), vol. 33, pages 69 - 94
    - UMBRICHT, D.; KRLJES, S., "Mismatch negativity in schizophrenia: a meta-analysis", SCHIZOPHR RES, (2005), vol. 76, doi:doi:10.1016/j.schres.2004.12.002, pages 1 - 23, XP025357445

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.schres.2004.12.002
    - WERBER, A.E.; KLEIN, C.; RABEY, J.M., "Evaluation of cholinergic treatment in demented patients by P300 evoked related potentials", NEUROL NEUROCHIR POL, (2001), vol. 35, no. 3, pages 37 - 43