blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2889033 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2889033



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 185
25.01.2019 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
03.04.2018 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
22.02.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
19.01.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.01.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
19.01.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
19.01.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
04.01.2018 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
20.09.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
20.09.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
20.09.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
20.09.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 23
20.09.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 23
03.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
03.05.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
03.05.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
03.05.2017 Claims Search / examination 2
03.05.2017 Description Search / examination 2
03.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
03.05.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.03.2017 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
06.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
06.03.2017 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.11.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
08.11.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
20.10.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
22.12.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
22.12.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
22.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
22.12.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
22.12.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
22.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
22.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
08.10.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
29.09.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
13.07.2015 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
06.07.2015 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
15.06.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.06.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.06.2015 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 1
03.06.2015 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
13.05.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
21.04.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
21.04.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 4
21.04.2015 European search report Search / examination 4
10.04.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
14.01.2015 Abstract Search / examination 1
14.01.2015 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
14.01.2015 Claims Search / examination 3
14.01.2015 Description Search / examination 17
14.01.2015 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
14.01.2015 Drawings Search / examination 3
14.01.2015 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
18.06.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 18