blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2889033


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
25.01.2019 No opposition filed within time limit published on  27.02.2019  [2019/09]
16.02.2018 (Expected) grant published on  21.03.2018  [2018/12]
12.02.2018 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
12.02.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.01.2018 Change - divisional application(s) published on  28.02.2018  [2018/09]
24.01.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
24.01.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
19.01.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
05.01.2018 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
19.09.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
04.08.2017 Change - German title published on  06.09.2017  [2017/36]
05.05.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
07.03.2017 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
18.11.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
18.11.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.11.2016 First examination report
22.12.2015 Amendment by applicant
03.11.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.10.2015 Change - representative
10.07.2015 Change - applicant published on  12.08.2015  [2015/33]
30.06.2015 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  01.07.2015  [2015/27]
29.05.2015 Request for examination filed published on  01.07.2015  [2015/27]
21.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.01.2015 Change - representative