blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP2889033

Designated contracting states AT 
 BE 
 BG 
 CH 
CY 
 CZ 
 DE 
 DK 
 EE 
 ES 
 FI 
 FR 
 GB 
 GR 
 HR 
 HU 
 IE 
 IS 
 IT 
 LI 
 LT 
 LU 
LV 
 MC 
 MK 
 MT 
 NL 
 NO 
 PL 
 PT 
 RO 
 SE 
 SI 
 SK 
 SM 
 TR 
Examination procedure19.01.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
14.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
14.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
14.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
29.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
15.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
07.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201709   M06   Fee paid on   07.02.2018
European patent granted21.03.2018
Opposition procedure02.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit published on 27.02.2019 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:01.07.2015 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:2540297
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:01.07.2015 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:2355822
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:01.07.2015 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:01.07.2015 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20150114
 
Event date:12.08.2015 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:FORUM PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
 
Event date:07.12.2016 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20161108
 
Event date:18.10.2017 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED
Effective DATE:20170920
 
Event date:21.03.2018 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:2540297
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:21.03.2018 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:21.03.2018 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:2355822
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:21.03.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:29.03.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:15.04.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT REF 980344 AT T
Code Expl.:+REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)
Effective DATE:20180415
 
Event date:18.04.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:19.04.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R096 602009051441 DE
Code Expl.:+DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT
 
Event date:18.06.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PT SC4A 2889033 PT 20180618 T
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE
Free Format Text:AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION
Effective DATE:20180608
 
Event date:19.06.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2673016 ES T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20180619
 
Event date:02.07.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK T3
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS
Effective DATE:20180627
 
Event date:11.07.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL FP
Code Expl.: TRANSLATION FOR EP FILED (ENTRY OF EP INTO COUNTRY)
 
Event date:17.07.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE TRGR
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT
 
Event date:15.08.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG EE FG4A E015583 EE
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF THE SPECIFICATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT VALID IN ESTONIA
Effective DATE:20180618
 
Event date:27.08.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NO T2
Code Expl.:+ENTRY OF EP PATENT INTO NATIONAL PHASE OF NORWAY
Effective DATE:20180321
 
Event date:28.09.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HU AG4A E037938 HU
Code Expl.:+FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS
 
Event date:01.10.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SK T3 E 27698 SK
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION INTO SLOVAKIAN
 
Event date:17.10.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:30.11.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SM
Payment DATE:20180927
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:31.12.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Payment DATE:20181105
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:31.12.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20181030
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:02.01.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R097 602009051441 DE
Code Expl.:+NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION
 
Event date:25.01.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GR EP 20180401728 GR
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE
Effective DATE:20190109
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:RO
Payment DATE:20181017
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20181108
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IS
Payment DATE:20181011
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Payment DATE:20181029
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Payment DATE:20181026
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CZ
Payment DATE:20181022
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:EE
Payment DATE:20181105
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Payment DATE:20181026
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Payment DATE:20181025
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LT
Payment DATE:20181109
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:20181029
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Payment DATE:20181026
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20181015
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:HU
Payment DATE:20181025
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NO
Payment DATE:20181026
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PL
Payment DATE:20181002
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Payment DATE:20181031
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SK
Payment DATE:20181023
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:27.02.2019 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20190102
 
Event date:28.02.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20181025
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:28.02.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20181017
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:28.02.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SI
Payment DATE:20181106
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:28.02.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20181119
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:28.02.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20181116
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:28.02.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BG
Payment DATE:20181004
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:28.02.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:TR
Payment DATE:20181022
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:28.02.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LV
Payment DATE:20181121
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:28.02.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20181203
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:28.02.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20181030
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:28.02.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MK
Payment DATE:20181031
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:28.02.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:HR
Payment DATE:20181030
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:31.07.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Payment DATE:20181022
Year of Fee Payment:10